District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1030 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 11/12/2024

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
  
A BILL 
1 
 2 
25-1030 
3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
__________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act to 10 
clarify the definition of “subscriber organization,” to amend the 	Lead-Hazard Prevention 11 
and Elimination Act of 2008 	to clarify the definition of “lead-based paint,” and to amend 12 
the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 	to clarify the definition 13 
of “producer.” 14 
 15 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 16 
act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification 17 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 18 
Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 19 
of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 (	D.C. Law 13- 107; D.C. Official Code § 34–1501(27A)	), is 20 
amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia 21 
law, or government entity, that owns” in its place.  22 
Sec. 3. Section 2 (20) of the Lead -Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008, effective 23 
March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17-	381; D.C. Official Code § 8–231.01(20), is amended by striking 24 
the phrase “(0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 m g/cm²)” in its place.  25 
Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) 	of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act 26 
of 2014, effective February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-154; D.C. Official Code § 8–771.01(11)(A)), 27    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
  
is amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who 
28 
manufactures a” in its place. 29 
Sec. 5. Applicability. 30 
(a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013. 31 
(b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. 32 
(c) Section 4 shall apply as of Mar	ch 16, 2021. 33 
Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 34 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 35 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 36 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 37 
Sec. 7. Effective date. 38 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 39 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-	day period of congressional review as 40 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 41 
1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-	206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 42 
Columbia Register.  43 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 44