District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1030 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
1+ ENGROSSED ORIGINAL
22
33
44
55
66 1
77
8-AN ACT
9-
10-_____________
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-_____________________________
15-
16-
17-To amend, on a temporary basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act to
18-clarify the definition of the term subscriber organization; to amend the Lead -Hazard
19-Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008 to clarify the definition of the term lead -based
20-paint; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014
21-to clarify the definition of the term producer.
22-
23-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
24-act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification
25-Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”.
26-
27-Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act
28-of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 ( D.C. Law 13- 107; D.C. Official Code § 34- 1501(27A)), is
29-amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia
30-law, or government entity, that owns” in its place.
31-
32-Sec. 3. Section 2 (20) of the Lead -Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008,
33-effective March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17- 381; D.C. Official Code § 8- 231.01(20 )), is amended by
34-striking the phrase “ (0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 m g/cm²)” in its place.
35-
36-Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act
37-of 2014, effective March 16, 2021 ( D.C. Law 23- 211; D.C. Official Code § 8- 771.01(11)(A)), is
38-amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who
39-manufactures a” in its place.
40-
41-Sec. 5. Applicability.
42-(a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013.
43-(b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021.
44-(c) Section 4 shall apply as of Mar ch 16, 2021.
45-
46- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
8+A BILL
9+1
10+ 2
11+25-1030
12+3
13+ 4
14+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5
15+ 6
16+__________________ 7
17+ 8
18+ 9
19+To amend, on a temporary basis, the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act to 10
20+clarify the definition of “subscriber organization,” to amend the Lead-Hazard Prevention 11
21+and Elimination Act of 2008 to clarify the definition of “lead-based paint,” and to amend 12
22+the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 to clarify the definition 13
23+of “producer.” 14
24+ 15
25+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 16
26+act may be cited as the “Department of Energy and Environment Definitions Clarification 17
27+Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 18
28+Sec. 2. Section 101(27A) of the Retail Electric Competition and Consumer Protection Act 19
29+of 1999, effective May 9, 2000 ( D.C. Law 13- 107; D.C. Official Code § 34–1501(27A) ), is 20
30+amended by striking the phrase “Columbia law that owns” and inserting the phrase “Columbia 21
31+law, or government entity, that owns” in its place. 22
32+Sec. 3. Section 2 (20) of the Lead -Hazard Prevention and Elimination Act of 2008, effective 23
33+March 31, 2009 (D.C. Law 17- 381; D.C. Official Code § 8–231.01(20), is amended by striking 24
34+the phrase “(0.7 µg/cm²)” and inserting the phrase “(0.7 m g/cm²)” in its place. 25
35+Sec. 4. Section 128(11)(A) of the Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act 26
36+of 2014, effective February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-154; D.C. Official Code § 8–771.01(11)(A)), 27 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL
4737
4838
4939
5040
5141 2
5242
53-Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement.
54-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
55-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
56-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a).
57-
58-Sec. 7. Effective date.
59-(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by
60-the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and a 30-day period of congressional review
61-as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December
62-24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- 206.02(c)(1)).
63-(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect.
64-
65-
66-
67-______________________________
68-Chairman
69-Council of the District of Columbia
70-
71-
72-
73-
74-
75-_________________________________
76-Mayor
77-District of Columbia
78-
43+is amended by striking the phrase “who manufacturers a” and inserting the phrase “who
44+28
45+manufactures a” in its place. 29
46+Sec. 5. Applicability. 30
47+(a) Section 2 shall apply as of December 13, 2013. 31
48+(b) Section 3 shall apply as of March 16, 2021. 32
49+(c) Section 4 shall apply as of Mar ch 16, 2021. 33
50+Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 34
51+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 35
52+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 36
53+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § l-301.47a). 37
54+Sec. 7. Effective date. 38
55+(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 39
56+the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30- day period of congressional review as 40
57+provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 41
58+1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- 206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 42
59+Columbia Register. 43
60+(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 44