District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1050 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/27/2024

                            1 
 
 1 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 2 
Councilmember Zachary Parker         Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 6 
Councilmember Anita Bonds                   Councilmember Robert C. White	, Jr. 7 
 8 
 9 
 10 
A BILL 11 
 12 
_________ 13 
 14 
 15 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 16 
 17 
__________________ 18 
 19 
 20 
To amend, on an temporary basis, Title 28 of the District of Columbia Official Code, to extend  21 
the applicability date of the cashless retailer prohibition to January 1, 2026.  22 
 23 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 24 
act may be cited as the “	Cashless Retailer Extension Temporary 	Amendment Act of 2024”	. 25 
Sec. 2. Section 28-5402 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended by striking 26 
the phrase “Beginning January 1, 2025, a retailer	” and inserting the phrase “Beginning January 27 
1, 2026, a retailer” in its place. 28 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 29 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 30 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 31 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 32 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 33 
 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 34 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer 35  2 
 
than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in 36 
section 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 37 
Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)).  38 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 39