District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1055 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/03/2024

                              ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
__________________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Office of District Waterways 
Management Establishment Act of 2022 to make the process for Mayoral appointment of 
members of the District Waterways Advisory Commission consistent with that of similar 
commissions, to add the Department of Parks and Recreation as an ex-officio non-voting 
member of the District Waterways Advisory Commission, to adjust the District Waterways 
Advisory Commission meeting schedule to allow sufficient time for engagement with 
stakeholders and the District Waterways Advisory Commission in development of the 
Advisory Plan, and to provide the District Waterways Advisory Commission with authority 
to determine whether the Advisory Plan needs to be updated and extend the update period 
to at least every 3 years; and to amend the Confirmation Act of 1978 to make a conforming 
amendment. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Office of District Waterways Management Establishment Congressional 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. The Office of District Waterways Management Establishment Act of 2022, 
effective March 22, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-	336; D.C. Official Code § 8-191.01 	et seq.), is amended 
as follows:  
(a) Section 3 (D.C. Official Code § 8-191.02) is amended as follows:  
(1) Subsection (b)(1)(A) is amended by striking the phrase “section 2(e) of the 
Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-	141; D.C. Official Code § 1-
523.01(e)),” and inserting the phrase “section 2(f) of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective 
March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-141; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01(f)),” in its place.  
(2) Subsection (c) is amended as follows:  
(A) Paragraph (9) is amended by striking the phrase “; and” and inserting a 
semicolon in its place.  
(B) Paragraph (10) is amended by striking the period and inserting the 
phrase “; and” in its place.  
(C) A new paragraph (11) is added to read as follows:  
“(11) The Department of Parks and Recreation.”.     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
(3) Subsection (f) is amended by striking the phrase “once every month” and 
inserting the phrase “once every 2 months” in its place.  
(b) Section 4 (D.C. Official Code § 8-191.03) is amended as follows:  
(1) The lead-in language of subsection (a) is amended as follows:  
(A) Strike the phrase “one year” and insert the phrase “2 years” in its place.  
(B) Strike the phrase “develop and adopt” and insert the word “develop” in 
its place. 
(2) Subsection (b)(2) is amended by striking the phrase “At least 60 days prior to 
adoption of an Advisory Plan, the” and inserting the word “The” in its place.  
(3) Subsections (c) and (d) are amended to read as follows:  
“(c) After conclusion of the public comment period, and within 60 days after completing 
revisions, if any, the voting members of the Commission shall adopt the Advisory Plan. 
Thereupon, the Advisory Plan shall be submitted to the Office of Waterways Management for 
publication.  
“(d) If considered necessary by the Commission, the Advisory Plan shall be updated at 
least once every 3 years, following the same process required for the initial Advisory Plan pursuant 
to subsections (b) and (c) of this section.”.  
 
Sec. 3. Section 2(f) of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-141; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01(f)), is amended as follows:  
(a) Paragraph (72) is amended by striking the phrase “; and” and inserting a semicolon in 
its place. 
(b) Paragraph (73) is amended by striking the period and inserting the phrase “; and” in its 
place. 
(c) A new paragraph (74) is added to read as follows:  
“(74) The Office of District Waterways Management, established by section 2(a) 
of the Office of District Waterways Management Establishment Act of 2022, effective March 22, 
2023 (D.C. Law 24-336; D.C. Official Code § 8-191.01(a)).”.  
  
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than    ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
3 
 
 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
 
___________________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia