1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | 1 |
---|
6 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | ____________ |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
| 1 | + | MURIEL BOWSER |
---|
| 2 | + | MAYOR |
---|
| 3 | + | November 25, 2024 |
---|
| 4 | + | The Honorable Phil Mendelson |
---|
| 5 | + | Chairman, Council |
---|
| 6 | + | of the District of Columbia |
---|
| 7 | + | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 |
---|
| 8 | + | Washington, DC 20004 |
---|
| 9 | + | Dear Chairman Mendelson: |
---|
| 10 | + | Enclosed for consideration and enactment by the Council |
---|
| 11 | + | of the District of Columbia is an |
---|
| 12 | + | emergency bill, the "Contract No. |
---|
| 13 | + | CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC |
---|
| 14 | + | Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act |
---|
| 15 | + | of 2024", and the accompanying |
---|
| 16 | + | emergency declaration resolution, in the not-to-exceed price |
---|
| 17 | + | of $15,848,608.48. The contract's |
---|
| 18 | + | period |
---|
| 19 | + | of performance is August 2, 2024, through August 1, 2029. |
---|
| 20 | + | The legislation will approve multi year Contract No. |
---|
| 21 | + | CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing |
---|
| 22 | + | Company, LLC for structural firefighting personal protective equipment. In addition, the |
---|
| 23 | + | legislation will approve payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the |
---|
| 24 | + | contract. |
---|
| 25 | + | I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this contract. In order to |
---|
| 26 | + | facilitate a response to any questions, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, Chief Operating |
---|
| 27 | + | Officer, Office |
---|
| 28 | + | of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759. |
---|
| 29 | + | I urge you to take prompt and favorable action regarding the enclosed legislation. 2 |
---|
| 30 | + | 3 |
---|
| 31 | + | 4 |
---|
| 32 | + | 5 |
---|
| 33 | + | 6 |
---|
| 34 | + | 7 |
---|
| 35 | + | 8 |
---|
| 36 | + | 9 |
---|
| 37 | + | 10 |
---|
| 38 | + | 11 |
---|
| 39 | + | 12 |
---|
| 40 | + | 13 |
---|
| 41 | + | 14 |
---|
| 42 | + | A BILL |
---|
| 43 | + | .?thairman Phil Mendelson |
---|
| 44 | + | at the request |
---|
| 45 | + | of the Mayor |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | ____________ |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. CW117729 with Globe |
---|
15 | | - | Manufacturing Company, LLC, and to authorize payment for the goods and services |
---|
16 | | - | received and to be received under the contract. |
---|
17 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
18 | | - | act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW117729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC |
---|
19 | | - | Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024” . |
---|
20 | | - | Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the Home Rule Act (D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.51) |
---|
21 | | - | and notwithstanding the requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18- 371; D.C. Official Code § 2- 352.02), the Council |
---|
22 | | - | approves multiyear Contract No. CW117729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC and |
---|
23 | | - | authorizes payment in the not -to-exceed amount of $15,848,608.48 for the goods and services |
---|
24 | | - | received and to be received under the contract. |
---|
25 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
26 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal |
---|
27 | | - | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). |
---|
28 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
29 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
30 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
31 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
32 | | - | |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | |
---|
35 | | - | 2 |
---|
36 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | ___________________________________ Chairman |
---|
39 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
40 | | - | _________________________________ Mayor |
---|
41 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
| 47 | + | 15 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. CWl 17729 with Globe |
---|
| 48 | + | 16 Manufacturing Company, LLC and to authorize payment for the goods and services |
---|
| 49 | + | 17 received and to be received under the contract. |
---|
| 50 | + | 18 |
---|
| 51 | + | 19 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
| 52 | + | 20 act may be cited as the "Contract No. CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC |
---|
| 53 | + | 21 Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024." |
---|
| 54 | + | 22 Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved |
---|
| 55 | + | 23 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code§ 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the |
---|
| 56 | + | 24 requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, |
---|
| 57 | + | 25 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D. C. Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves multiyear |
---|
| 58 | + | 26 Contract No. CWl 17729 with Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC and authorizes payment in |
---|
| 59 | + | 27 the not-to-exceed amount of $15,848,608.48 for the goods and services received and to be |
---|
| 60 | + | 28 received under the contract. |
---|
| 61 | + | 29 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
| 62 | + | 30 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal |
---|
| 63 | + | 31 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 197 5, |
---|
| 64 | + | 32 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code§ l-301.47a). 2 |
---|
| 65 | + | Sec. 4. Effective date. 1 |
---|
| 66 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 2 |
---|
| 67 | + | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 3 |
---|
| 68 | + | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 4 |
---|
| 69 | + | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 5 |
---|
| 70 | + | D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 6 |
---|
| 71 | + | 7 |
---|