District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1070 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/12/2024

                            1 
 
 1 
  _____________________________ 2 
  Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_________________________ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
 11 
_________________________ 12 
 13 
 14 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Language Access Act of 2004 to authorize the Office of 15 
Human Rights to adopt rules and regulations to implement the provisions of that act. 16 
 17 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 18 
act may be cited as the “Language Access Rulemaking Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 19 
Sec. 2. Section 6 of the Language Access Act of 2004, effective June 19, 2004 (D.C. Law 20 
15-167; D.C. Official Code § 2-1935) is amended by adding a new subsection (c) to read as 21 
follows: 22 
 “(c) The Mayor, pursuant to Title I of the District of Columbia Administrative Procedure 23 
Act, approved October 21, 1968 (82 Stat. 1204; D.C. Official Code § 2-501 et seq.), shall issue 24 
rules to implement the provisions of this act.  25 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 26 
This act shall apply as of June 19, 2004. 27 
Sec. 4 Fiscal impact statement. 28 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 29 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 30 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 31 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 32  2 
 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 33 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 34 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 35 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 36 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 37