District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill CER25-0148 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 11/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL        
1 
 
 
A CEREMONIAL RESOLUTION 
 
25-148 
  
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
November 7, 2023 
 To recognize the important role of the historic Eastern Market to Capitol Hill and the District, 
commemorate its 150th anniversary, and declare November 12, 2023 “Eastern Market 
Day” in the District of Columbia. 
 WHEREAS, Eastern Market is located at 	225 7th Street, SE, between North Carolina 
Avenue, SE, and C Street, SE in Ward 6;  
 WHEREAS, Pierre L’Enfant’s original plans for the city of Washington purposefully 
designated space for local markets; 
 WHEREAS, Eastern Market was designed by German-born immigrant and architect Adolf 
Cluss, a renowned local architect of the time, City Engineer, and member of the Board of Public 
Works, who also designed the Smithsonian Arts and Industries Building; 
 WHEREAS, Eastern Market’s construction was completed on November 12, 1873; 
 WHEREAS, the original vendors sold meat, poultry, butter, vegetables, and oysters; 
 WHEREAS, in 1908, the Center and North Halls were added to the Market as Capitol 
Hill’s population grew;  
 WHEREAS, Eastern Market was designated a District of Columbia Historic Landmark in 
1964 and a National Historic Landmark in 1971; 
 WHEREAS, in 1999, the Council passed legislation to reform how Eastern Market would 
be managed, regulated, and improved, including by creating an Eastern Market Community 
Advisory Committee (“EMCAC”) to protect the Market and advocate for and advise on its management, operations, and budget; 
 WHEREAS, on April 30, 2007, Eastern Market experienced a devastating fire, 	which 
caused extensive damage to the building and the vendors’ shops; 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 	2 
WHEREAS, the EMCAC, Capitol Hill Community Foundation, then	-Councilmember 
Tommy Wells, Mayor Adrian Fenty, the District government	, and the community 	came together 
to rebuild the damaged market and restore its historic architectural features; 
 
WHEREAS, Eastern Market reopened on June 26, 2009; 
 
WHEREAS, for 150 years, Eastern Market has provided s	pace for local and regional 
vendors to sell their wares to District residents and visitors	;  
 
WHEREAS, Eastern Market is one of the few historic public market buildings in the 
District, and it is the only one to retain its original public market function; 
 
WHEREAS, Eastern Market’s indoor market operates from Tuesday to Saturday, 8am to 
6pm, and Sundays from 9am to 5pm; 
 
WHEREAS, on the weekends, Eastern Market operates the outdoor Farmer’s Market and 
Arts and Crafts Market;  
 
WHEREAS, Eastern Market houses incredible indoor vendors, including florists, 
cheesemongers, butchers, fruit and vegetable grocers, bakers, and delicatessens; 
 
WHEREAS, Eastern Market’s open-air farmer’s market provides the best, freshest produce 
in the region, with most grown in rural Maryland, Pennsylvania, Virginia, and West Virginia; 
 
WHEREAS, Eastern Market’s weekend outdoor vendors offer wares both local and global, 
ranging from African art to locally-	made children’s apparel, beauty products to vintage clothing, 
and jewelry to delicious food and drinks; 
 
WHEREAS, in 2022, Councilmember Charles Allen brought together District government 
leadership, the EMCAC, vendor and artist representatives, Eastern Market and Barracks Row Main 
Streets, the Capitol Hill BID, Capitol Hill Village, neighbors, and market leadership to plan a year 
of events befitting Eastern Market’s important role in the life of the District; and 
 
WHEREAS, the kick-off to celebrating the year of Eastern Market’s 150th anniversary will 
take place throughout the weekend of November 10th to 12th	, 2023, and include living history 
impersonators, artists, cooking demonstrations, a fundraiser, a scavenger hunt, a ghost tour, and 
walking tours.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Eastern Market 150th Anniversary Recognition Resolution of 
2023”. 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 	3 
 Sec. 2. The Council recognizes the important role of the historic Eastern Market to Capitol 
Hill and the District, commemorates its 150th anniversary, and declares November 12, 2023 
“Eastern Market Day” in the District of Columbia 
 
 Sec. 3. This resolution shall take effect immediately.