District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill CER25-0277 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/01/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
1 
 
 
 
A CEREMONIAL RESOLUTION 
 
25-276 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 1, 2024 
 
 
To recognize and commemorate the life of Keith A. Silver, a longtime community leader, civil 
rights activist, and advocate for DC Statehood who ever faithfully galvanized citizens 
across the District to participate in the positive community events on the occasion of his 
passing on July 9, 2024. 
 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Silver was born in Washington, DC on October 30, 1953 ; 
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver graduated from DC Public Schools, culminating in his graduation 
from Anacostia High School (Class of 1971)	; 
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver went on to become a proud student in the paralegal program at 
Antioch Law School (now known as UDC School of Law), graduating in 1978; 
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver was a dependable volunteer and devoted member of New Bethel 
Baptist Church, located on 1739 9
th
 Street, NW; 
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver was a faithful family man who took pride in his children and his 
grandchildren, making sure to instill in them the history of the civil rights movement nationwide 
and in DC;  
 
WHEREAS, over the course of his life, Mr. Silver fully immersed himself in the civil 
rights movement in many ways, including providing ground support for the family of Dr. Martin 
Luther King, Jr. family during public events in Washington, D.C. and Atlanta ; 
 
WHEREAS, in the 1980s, Mr. Silver served with distinction as National Staff in the 
Southern Christian Leadership Conference (SCLC) under the leadership of President Rev. Joseph 
Lowery; 
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver also served as Community Assistant to Eddie Kendrick, founding 
member of the legendary R&B group, The Temptations, f	rom 1982 to Oct. 5, 1992, when Mr. 
Kendrick passed; 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
2 
 
 WHEREAS, Mr. Silver also served as a staffer to the Honorable Wilhelmina Rolark, 
former Councilmember of Ward 8, 	from 1988 to 1992, before working for 13 years as an 
assistant to Ms. Rolark during her tenure as President of the United Black Fund;  
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver designed national and local banners as Silver "K" Customized 
Banners for National Civil and Human Rights Organizations, Church Groups, Non-	Profits and 
Celebrities and Athletes, for over 4 decades; 
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver was also a Co-Founder of the Martin Luther King Peace Walk, 
which takes place every January in Ward 8, a 4	-term ANC Commissioner, and a dedicated 
precinct captain at P	recinct 1, located at Walker-Jones Middle School; 
 
WHEREAS, Mr. Silver also served as a special assistant an d confidant to civil rights 
figures such as the Honorable Walter E. Fauntroy, “The Black Eagle” Joe Madison, and Dick 
Gregory. 
 
 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Keith A. Silver Memorial Recognition Resolution of 2024.”  
 
 Sec. 2.  The Council of the District of Columbia hereby honors and 	Keith Silver and 
honors his legacy as a “man of purpose” and committed servant of the community	, who 
dedicated his life to civil rights and activism in the District. 
 
 Sec. 3.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.