LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
PR25-0003
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0003
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0003
Action History
Council
01/20/2023
Resolution R25-0003, Effective from Jan 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 000671
Council
01/17/2023
Retained by the Council
Council
01/06/2023
Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0003 Published in the DC Register
Council
01/03/2023
Approved with Resolution Number R25-0003
Council
01/03/2023
Final Reading
Council
01/02/2023
Introduced in Office of the Secretary