Council | 03/17/2023 | Withdrawn | ||
Council | 02/06/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/03/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/31/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/13/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0045 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/20/2022 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 12/13/2022 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |