District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0054 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/17/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-8  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
January 17, 2023 
 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to allow consumers to request that credit reporting agencies include a statement with their 
credit reports to indicate they were financially impacted by the COVID-19 pandemic. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Extension Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 Sec. 2. (a) On October 4, 2022, the Council adopted the Public Health Emergency Credit 
Alert Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, enacted October 31, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-
622; 69 DCR 16001) (“emergency act”). The emergency a ct will expire on January 29, 2023. 
(b) On October 18, 2022, the Council passed the Public Health Emergency Credit Alert 
Extension Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted November 21, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	647; 
69 DCR 14645) (“temporary measure”). The temporary measure was signed by the Mayor on 
November 21, 2022.  
(c) The temporary measure has not completed its 30 -day congressional review period. 
(d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 
the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary measure. 
 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Public 
Health Emergency Credit Alert Extension Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 
2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.