1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-12 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | January 17, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
15 | | - | to permit employees of District of Columbia Public Schools to serve on the State Board of Education. |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
18 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “State Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second |
---|
19 | | - | Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023” . |
---|
20 | | - | |
---|
21 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On March 1, 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education |
---|
22 | | - | Membership Eligibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective March 28, 2022 (D .C. |
---|
23 | | - | Act 24-352; 69 DCR 2627) (“emergency act”). The emergency act ensure d that District of |
---|
24 | | - | Columbia Public Schools employees who wished to run for and serve on the State Board of |
---|
25 | | - | Education were eligible to do so in the 2022 election cycle . |
---|
26 | | - | (b) On April 5 , 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education Membership |
---|
27 | | - | Eligibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, effective June 30, 2022 ( D.C. Law 24-134; 69 |
---|
28 | | - | DCR 4411) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is set to expire on February 10, 2023. |
---|
29 | | - | (c) On October 18, 2022, the Council passed the Elections Modernization Amendment |
---|
30 | | - | Act of 2021, enacted on November 21, 2022 (DC Act A24- 642; 69 DCR 14609) (“permanent |
---|
31 | | - | act”), which included a permanent version of these revisions. The permanent act is pending |
---|
32 | | - | congressional review. |
---|
33 | | - | (c) Congressional review emergency legislation is now necessary to prevent a gap in the |
---|
34 | | - | law between the expiration of the temporary act and the effective date of the permanent act. |
---|
35 | | - | |
---|
36 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances |
---|
37 | | - | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the State Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
38 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
39 | | - | |
---|
40 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | ________________________________ _____________________________ ______ 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | Councilmember Charles Allen Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 2 |
---|
| 4 | + | 3 |
---|
| 5 | + | 4 |
---|
| 6 | + | 5 |
---|
| 7 | + | 6 |
---|
| 8 | + | 7 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 10 | + | 9 |
---|
| 11 | + | _______ 10 |
---|
| 12 | + | 11 |
---|
| 13 | + | 12 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13 |
---|
| 15 | + | 14 |
---|
| 16 | + | ____________ 15 |
---|
| 17 | + | 16 |
---|
| 18 | + | 17 |
---|
| 19 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to 18 |
---|
| 20 | + | protect the rights of employees of District of Columbia Public Schools to serve on the State 19 |
---|
| 21 | + | Board of Education which will soon become permanent law. 20 |
---|
| 22 | + | 21 |
---|
| 23 | + | RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 |
---|
| 24 | + | resolution may be cited as the “State Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second 23 |
---|
| 25 | + | Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On March 1, 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education 25 |
---|
| 27 | + | Membership Eligibility Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective March 28, 2022 (D.C. 26 |
---|
| 28 | + | Act 24-352; 69 DCR 2627) (“emergency act”). The emergency act ensured that District of 27 |
---|
| 29 | + | Columbia Public Schools employees who wished to run for and serve on the State Board of 28 |
---|
| 30 | + | Education were eligible to do so in the 2022 election cycle. 29 |
---|
| 31 | + | (b) On April 5, 2022, the Council passed the State Board of Education Membership 30 |
---|
| 32 | + | Eligibility Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on May 3, 2022 (D.C. Law 24-134-394; 31 |
---|
| 33 | + | 69 DCR 4411) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is set to expire on February 10, 2023. 32 2 |
---|
| 34 | + | (c) On October 18, 2022 the Council passed the Elections Modernization Amendment 33 |
---|
| 35 | + | Act of 2021, enacted November 21, 2022 (DC Act A24-642; 69 DCR 14609), which included a 34 |
---|
| 36 | + | permanent version of the revisions to eligibility of the State Board of Education. This Act has yet 35 |
---|
| 37 | + | to be approved by Congress. 36 |
---|
| 38 | + | (c) Congressional review emergency legislation is now necessary to prevent a gap in the 37 |
---|
| 39 | + | law between the expiration of the temporary act and the effective date of the permanent act. 38 |
---|
| 40 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 39 |
---|
| 41 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the State 40 |
---|
| 42 | + | Board of Education Membership Eligibility Second Congressional Review Emergency 41 |
---|
| 43 | + | Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 42 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43 |
---|