District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0083 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-17  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
February 7, 2023 
 To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Department of General Services Establishment Act of 2011 to exempt data that is security-sensitive from public dashboard disclosure requirements. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Protecting Security-Sensitive Dashboard Data Congressional 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 Sec. 2. (a) On October 18, 2022, the Council passed the Protecting Security	-Sensitive 
Dashboard Data Emergency Amendment Act of 2022 (“emergency act”)	. The emergency a ct 
became law on November 21, 2022, and will expire on February 19, 2023. 
(b) On November 1, 2022, the Council adopted the Protecting Security -Sensitive 
Dashboard Data Temporary Amendment Act of 2022 (“temporary act”)	. The temporary act was 
signed by the Mayor on November 22, 2022, 	and is currently under congressional review. 
(c) The temporary act will not complete the 30-day congressional review period until 
March 8, 2023. 
(d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 
the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Protecting Security-Sensitive Dashboard 
Data Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.