District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0085 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/02/2023

                    ______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Christina Henderson 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 
 9 
 10 
___________ 11 
 12 
 13 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 
 15 
____________________ 16 
 17 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 18 
to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to postpone the date by 19 
which students must be vaccinated against COVID-19.  20 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 
resolution may be cited as the “Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional 22 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”.  23 
Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council adopted the “Coronavirus Immunization of 24 
School Students Emergency Amendment Act of 2022”. The Act became law on November 22, 25 
2022 and will expire on February 20, 2023.  26 
(b) On November 15, 2022, the Council adopted the “Coronavirus Immunization of 27 
School Students Temporary Amendment Act of 2022”. The temporary measure was signed by 28 
the Mayor on December 8, 2022 and is currently under Congressional review. 29 
c) The measure will not complete the 30-day Congressional review period until March 8, 30 
2023.   31  (d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 32 
the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 33 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 34 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 35 
Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional Review Emergency Declaration 36 
Resolution of 2023 must be adopted after a single reading. 37 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 38