1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | 25-18 |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | February 7, 2023 |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
15 | | - | to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to postpone the date by |
---|
16 | | - | which students must be vaccinated against COVID-19. |
---|
17 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
18 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional |
---|
19 | | - | Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
20 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the Coronavirus Immunization of |
---|
21 | | - | School Students Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective November 22, 2022 (D.C. Act |
---|
22 | | - | 24-669; 69 DCR 14771), which is set to expire on February 20, 2023. |
---|
23 | | - | (b) On November 15, 2022, the Council passed on second reading the Coronavirus |
---|
24 | | - | Immunization of School Students Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on December 8, |
---|
25 | | - | 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 678; 69 DCR 15080), which is expected to complete congressional review |
---|
26 | | - | and become law on March 8, 2023. |
---|
27 | | - | (c) Congressional review emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law |
---|
28 | | - | between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
29 | | - | |
---|
30 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances |
---|
31 | | - | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the |
---|
32 | | - | Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional Review Emergency Amendment |
---|
33 | | - | Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | ______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | Councilmember Christina Henderson 2 |
---|
| 3 | + | 3 |
---|
| 4 | + | 4 |
---|
| 5 | + | 5 |
---|
| 6 | + | 6 |
---|
| 7 | + | 7 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 9 | + | 9 |
---|
| 10 | + | 10 |
---|
| 11 | + | ___________ 11 |
---|
| 12 | + | 12 |
---|
| 13 | + | 13 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 |
---|
| 15 | + | 15 |
---|
| 16 | + | ____________________ 16 |
---|
| 17 | + | 17 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 18 |
---|
| 19 | + | to amend the Immunization of School Students Act of 1979 to postpone the date by 19 |
---|
| 20 | + | which students must be vaccinated against COVID-19. 20 |
---|
| 21 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 |
---|
| 22 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional 22 |
---|
| 23 | + | Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 23 |
---|
| 24 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On November 1, 2022, the Council adopted the “Coronavirus Immunization of 24 |
---|
| 25 | + | School Students Emergency Amendment Act of 2022”. The Act became law on November 22, 25 |
---|
| 26 | + | 2022 and will expire on February 20, 2023. 26 |
---|
| 27 | + | (b) On November 15, 2022, the Council adopted the “Coronavirus Immunization of 27 |
---|
| 28 | + | School Students Temporary Amendment Act of 2022”. The temporary measure was signed by 28 |
---|
| 29 | + | the Mayor on December 8, 2022 and is currently under Congressional review. 29 |
---|
| 30 | + | c) The measure will not complete the 30-day Congressional review period until March 8, 30 |
---|
| 31 | + | 2023. 31 (d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 32 |
---|
| 32 | + | the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 33 |
---|
| 33 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 34 |
---|
| 34 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 35 |
---|
| 35 | + | Coronavirus Immunization of School Students Congressional Review Emergency Declaration 36 |
---|
| 36 | + | Resolution of 2023 must be adopted after a single reading. 37 |
---|
| 37 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 38 |
---|