District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0100 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
21
3-
4-
5- 1
6-A RESOLUTION
7-
8-25-32
9-
2+MURIELBOWSER
3+MAYOR
4+January31,2023
5+HonorablePhilMendelson
6+Chairman
7+CounciloftheDistrictofColumbia
8+JohnA.WilsonBuilding
9+1350PennsylvaniaAvenue,NW,Suite504
10+Washington,DC20004
11+DearChairmanMendelson:
12+EnclosedforconsiderationandapprovalbytheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiaisan
13+emergencybill,the“ModificationNos.6,7,8,and9toContractNo.CW93185withGenuine
14+PartsCompanyd/b/a/NAPAAutoPartsApprovalandPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyActof
15+2023,”andtheaccompanyingemergencydeclarationresolution.
16+ThelegislationwillapproveModificationNos.6,7,8,and9toContractNo,CW93185for
17+operationalandlogisticalmanagement,inventorycontrol,andvehiclepartstotheFireand
18+EmergencyMedicalServicesfleet/apparatusdivision,andwillauthorizepaymentforthegoods
19+andservicesreceivedandtobereceivedunderthemodifications.
20+Ifyouhaveanyquestionsregardingthislegislation,pleasecontactMareScott,ChiefOperating
21+Officer,OfficeofContractingandProcurement,at(202)724-8759.
22+IlookforwardtotheCouncil’spromptandfavorableactionontheenclosedlegislation.
23+Sincerely,
24+furiplBowser SocwmrdsHwaevn—
25+i
26+12
27+13
28+14
29+15
30+16
31+17
32+18
33+19
34+20
35+21
36+22
37+23
38+24
39+25
40+26
41+27
42+28
43+29
44+30
45+31
46+32
47+33
48+34
49+pbouee—
50+ChairmanPhilMendelson
51+attherequestoftheMayor
52+APROPOSEDRESOLUTION
1053 INTHECOUNCILOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA
11-
12-February 7, 2023
1354 TodeclaretheexistenceofanemergencywithrespecttotheneedtoapproveModificationNos.
1455 6,7,8,and9toContractNo.CW93185withGenuinePartsCompanyd/b/a/NAPAAuto
1556 Partstoprovideoperationalandlogisticalmanagement,inventorycontrol,andvehicle
1657 partstotheFireandEmergencyMedicalServicesfleet/apparatusdivision,andto
17-authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the modifications.
18-
58+authorizepaymentforthegoodsandservicesreceivedandtobereceivedunderthe
59+modifications.
1960 RESOLVED,BYTHECOUNCILOFTHEDISTRICTOFCOLUMBIA,Thatthis
2061 resolutionmaybecitedasthe“ModificationNos.6,7,8,and9toContractNo.CW93185with
21-Genuine Parts Company d/ b/a/ NAPA Auto Parts Approval and Payment Authorization
62+GenuinePartsCompanyd/b/a)NAPAAutoPartsApprovalandPaymentAuthorization
2263 EmergencyDeclarationResolutionof2023”.
2364 Sec.2.(a)ThereexistsaneedtoapproveModificationNos.6,7,8,and9toContract
2465 No.CW93185withGenuinePartsCompanyd/b/a/NAPAAutoPartstoprovideoperationaland
2566 logisticalmanagement,inventorycontrol,andvehiclepartstotheFireandEmergencyMedical
26-Services Department’s (“FEMS”) fleet/apparatus division and to authorize payment for the
27-goods and services received and to be received under the modifications.
67+ServicesDepartment'sfleet/apparatusdivision,andtoauthorizepaymentforthegoodsand
68+servicesreceivedandtobereceivedunderthemodifications.
2869 (b)ByModificationNo.6,datedAugust6,2022,theOfficeofContractingand
29-Procurement, on behalf of FEMS , exercised a part of Option Year One of Contract No.
30-CW93185 for the period August 6, 2022, through November 5, 2022, in the not -to-exceed
31-amount of $417,500.
70+Procurement,onbehalfofFEMS,exercisedapartofoptionyearoneofContractNo.CW93185 35
71+36
72+37
73+38
74+39
75+40
76+41
77+42
78+B
79+44
80+45
81+46
82+47
83+48
84+49
85+50
86+51
87+53
88+54
89+55
90+56
91+57
92+fortheperiodAugust6,2022throughNovember5,2022inthenot-to-exceedamountof
93+$417,500,
3294 (c)ByModificationNo.7,datedOctober25,2022,theOfficeofContractingand
33-Procurement, on behalf of FEMS , exercised an additional part of Option Year One of Contract
34-No. CW93185 f or the period November 6, 2022, through December 31, 2022, in the additional
35-not-to-exceed amount of $232,500.
95+Procurement,onbehalfofFEMS,exercisedanadditionalpartofoptionyearoneofContractNo.
96+CWO93185fortheperiodNovember6,2022throughDecember31,2022intheadditionalnot-to-
97+exceedamountof$232,500.
3698 (d)ByModificationNo.8,datedDecember15,2022,theOfficeofContractingand
37-Procurement, on behalf of FEMS , exercised an additional part of Option Year One of Contract
38-No. CW93185 for the period January 1, 2023, through February 15, 2023, in the additional not-
39-to-exceed amount of $100,000.
99+Procurement,onbehalfofFEMS,exercisedanadditionalpartofoptionyearoneofContractNo.
100+CW93185fortheperiodJanuary1,2023throughFebruary15,2023intheadditionalnot-to-
101+exceedamountof$100,000.
40102 (e)ModificationNo.9isnownecessarytoexercisetheremainderofoptionyearoneof
41-Contract No. CW93185 for the period February 16, 2023, through August 5, 2023, in the amount
42-of $783,000, raising the total not -to-exceed amount for Option Year One to $1,533,000. ENROLLED ORIGINAL
103+ContractNo.CW93185fortheperiodFebruary16,2023throughAugust5,2023intheamount
104+of$783,000,raisingthetotalnot-to-exceedamountforoptionperiodoneto$1,533,000.
105+()Councilapprovalisrequiredbysection451(b)(I)oftheDistrictofColumbiaHome
106+RuleAct,approvedDecember24,1973(87Stat.803;D.C.OfficialCode§1-204.51(b)(1))since
107+thesemodificationswillincreasethevalueofthecontracttomorethan$1millionduringa12-
108+monthperiod.
109+(g)Approvalonanemergencybasisisnecessarytoallowthecontinuationofthesevital
110+services.Withoutthisapproval,GenuinePartsCompanyd/b/a/NAPAAutoPartscannotbepaid
111+forgoodsandservicesprovidedinexcessof$1millionfortheperiodAugust6,2022through
112+August5,2023.
113+Sec.3.TheCounciloftheDistrictofColumbiadeterminesthatthecircumstances
114+enumeratedinsection2constituteemergencycircumstancesmakingitnecessarythatthe 58
115+59
116+60
117+61
43118
44-
45-
46- 2
47-(f) Council approval is required by section 451(b) (1) of the District of Columbia Home
48-Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.51(b)(1)), as
49-these modifications will increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million during a 12-
50-month period. (g) Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital
51-services. Without this approval, Genuine Parts Company d/ b/a/ NAPA Auto Parts cannot be paid
52-for goods and services provided in excess of $1 million for the period from August 6, 2022,
53-through August 5, 2023.
54-
55-Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances
56-enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 6, 7, 8, and 9 to Contract No. CW93185 with Genuine Parts Company d/ b/a/
119+ModificationNos.6,7,8,and9toContractNo.CW93185withGenuinePartsCompanyd/b/a/
57120 NAPAAutoPartsApprovalandPaymentAuthorizationEmergencyActof2023beadopted
58-after a single reading.
121+afterasinglereading,
59122 Sec.4.Thisresolutionshalltakeeffectimmediately.