1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 1 | + | 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | _____________________________ _________________________ 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | Councilmember Trayon White, S |
---|
| 4 | + | r. Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | 8 9 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 11 |
---|
| 12 | + | 12 13 |
---|
| 13 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 14 |
---|
| 14 | + | to amend Chapter 35 of Title 47 of the District of Columbia Official Code to provide an 15 |
---|
| 15 | + | additional property tax exemption for homeowners of the River East at Grandview 16 |
---|
| 16 | + | Condominium. 17 18 |
---|
| 17 | + | 19 RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DI STRICT OF COLUM BIA, That this |
---|
| 18 | + | 20 resolution may be cited as the “River East at Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption |
---|
| 19 | + | 21 Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
| 20 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On October 18, 2022, the Council unanimously approved the “River East at 22 |
---|
| 21 | + | Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Emergency Amendment Act of 2022.” The 23 |
---|
| 22 | + | Emergency Act became law on November 3, 2022, and expired on February 1, 2023. 24 |
---|
| 23 | + | (b) On November 1, 2022, the Council unanimously approved the “River East at 25 |
---|
| 24 | + | Grandview Condominium Property Tax Exemption Temporary Amendment Act of 2022.” The 26 |
---|
| 25 | + | Temporary Act is in the has been transmitted to Congress, and the projected law date is March 8, 27 |
---|
| 26 | + | 2023. 28 |
---|
| 27 | + | (c) In order to address the gap in the law between the e xpiration of the Emergency Act 29 |
---|
| 28 | + | and the effective date of the Temporary Act, it is necessary to approve congressional review 30 |
---|
| 29 | + | emergency legislation. 31 |
---|
| 30 | + | 2 |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-22 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | February 7, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
16 | | - | to amend section 47- 3503 of the District of Columbia Official Code to provide for an |
---|
17 | | - | extended real property tax exemption for unit owners of the River East at Grandview |
---|
18 | | - | Condominiums for the duration of their relocation from the property. |
---|
19 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
20 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “River East at Grandview Condominiums Property Tax |
---|
21 | | - | Exemption Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On October 18, 2022, the Council passed the River East at Grandview |
---|
24 | | - | Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Emergency Amendment Act of 2022, effective |
---|
25 | | - | November 3, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 636; 69 DCR 14181) (“Emergency Act”). The Emergency Act |
---|
26 | | - | became law on November 3, 2022, and expired on February 1, 2023. |
---|
27 | | - | (b) On November 1, 2022, the Council passed the River East at Grandview |
---|
28 | | - | Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on |
---|
29 | | - | November 22, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 665; 69 DCR 14760) (“Temporary Act”). The Temporary Act |
---|
30 | | - | has been transmitted to Congress, and it is projected to become law on March 8, 2023. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) To address the gap in the law between the expiration of the Emergency Act and the |
---|
32 | | - | effective date of the Temporary Act, congressional review emergency legislation is necessary. |
---|
33 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances |
---|
34 | | - | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the River East at Grandview Condominiums Property Tax Exemption Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
35 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
36 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
| 32 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 32 |
---|
| 33 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the River 33 |
---|
| 34 | + | East at Grandview Estates Condominium Assistance Property Tax Exemption Congressional 34 |
---|
| 35 | + | Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2022 be adopted after a single reading. 35 |
---|
| 36 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 36 |
---|