Council | 06/16/2023 | Resolution R25-0153, Effective from Jun 06, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 008462 | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0153 | ||
Council | 05/31/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 05/31/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0193 | ||
Council | 05/26/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 05/15/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/05/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 05/01/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/21/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0193 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/11/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |