District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0199 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/02/2023

                              ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
  
  
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-135  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
May 2, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the District of 
Columbia Housing Authority Act of 1999 to clarify that the District of Columbia 
Housing Authority is subject to the District’s procurement statutes and amend the 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010 to make conforming changes.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “District of Columbia Housing Authority Procurement 
Clarification Emergency Amendment Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a). Section 20 of the District of Columbia Housing Authority Act of 1999, 
effective May 9, 2000 (D.C. Law 13-105; D.C. Official Code § 6-219), (“Act”) requires the 
District of Columbia Housing Authority (“DCHA”) to draft regulations governing procurements 
and submit those regulations to the Council for review.  
(b) Section 20 of the Act exempts DCHA from the requirements of the District of 
Columbia Procurement Practices Act of 1985, effective February 21, 1986 (D.C Law 6-85; D.C. 
Official Code § 2-301.01 et seq.) (“PPA”), a law which has been superseded by the Procurement 
Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 ((D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code 2-
351.01 et seq.) (“PPRA”).  
(c) Emergency legislation is necessary to clarify ambiguity in the law as to DCHA’s 
relationship to the PPRA. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the District of Columbia Housing Authority 
Procurement Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.