District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0214 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
1+April 26, 2023
2+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
3+1310SOUTHERN AVENUE. SE WASHINGTON. D.C. 20032-4623 • 202-574-6000 WWW.UNITED-MEDICALCENTER.COM
4+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
5+Chairman, Council of the District of Columbia
6+John A. Wilson Building
7+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
8+Suite 504
9+Washington, DC 20004
10+Council action is necessary to approve the December 7,2022, fully exercised Option Year
11+3 Modification 7 (in the amount of $800,000.00 and a period of October 31, 2022 to
12+October 30,2023) and Proposed Modification 8 (in the amount of $800,000.00 and a period
13+of October 31, 2022 to October 30, 2023) because when combined, the total retroactive
14+contract value of Option Year 3 would be $1,600,000.00 for the 12-month period, October
15+31, 2022 to October 30, 2023. Continued approval is vital to avoiding a major disruption
16+in these services. The unfortunate retroactivity, which as discussed during recent oversight
17+hearings, is due to constantly increasing nurse agency costs, extended time needed to
18+negotiate financial terms, nationwide industry shortages, and the pending wind down.
19+As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this submittal.
20+In order to facilitate a response to any questions you may have, please have your staff
21+contact me at (202) 574-6611.1 look forward to a favorable consideration on this contract.
22+Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is
23+Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit
24+Hospital Corporation and Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc., Approval and Payment
25+Authorization Emergency Act of 2023, and Contract No. NFPHCNUR-1 9-C-003
26+Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and
27+Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency
28+Declaration Resolution of2023, for the provision for specialty and non-specialty temporary
29+assignment nurses.
30+Sincerely,
31+Jacqueline Payne-Borden
32+Chief Executive Officer
33+Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation
34+Enclosures
35+UNITED
36+' MXDiCAl CIKTU A
37+ RESOLUTION
38+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
39+RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That
40+this resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 728
41+and 8 between the Not-for-profit Hospital Corporation and Contemporary Nursing29
42+Solutions Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution30
43+of 2023”.31
44+Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No.32
45+NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 (“Contract”) between the Not-for-Profit33
46+Hospital Corporation (“Hospital”) and Contemporary Nursing Solutions, Inc. for the34
47+provision for specialty and non-specialty temporary assignment nurses, and to authorize35
48+payment for the services received and to be received under this Contract.36
549 1
6-A RESOLUTION
7-
8-25-120
9-
10-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
11-
12-May 2, 2023
13-
14-
15-To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract No.
16-NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital
17-Corporation, commonly known as United Medical Center, and Contemporary Nursing
18-Solutions Inc. to provide specialty and non-specialty temporary assignment nurses, and to
19-authorize payment for the services received and to be received under the contract.
20-
21-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
22-resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8
23-Between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc.
24-Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”.
25-
26-Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-
27-003 Modifications 7 and 8 (“Contract”) between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation
28-(“Hospital”) and Contemporary Nursing Solutions, Inc. to provide specialty and non-specialty
29-temporary assignment nurses and to authorize payment for the services received and to be
30-received under the Contract.
31-(b) The Hospital determined that exercising option year 3 of the Contract was necessary
32-due to the ongoing need for specialty and non-specialty temporary assignment nurses.
33-Modification No. 7 had a value of $800,000 for the period October 31, 2022 through October 30,
34-2023.
35-(c) Proposed Modification No. 8 for an additional $800,000 is necessary to allow
36-continued use of the Contract. Council approval is necessary because the combined value of
37-option year 3 would be $1.6 million for the period October 31, 2022 through October 30, 2023.
38- (d) Without this approval, Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc. cannot be paid for these
39-critical services provided and to be provided in excess of $1 million.
40-
41-Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
42-emergency circumstances making it necessary that Contract No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003
43-Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and Contemporary
44-Nursing Solutions Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted
45-after a single reading.
46-
47-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
50+1
51+2
52+3
53+4
54+5
55+6
56+7
57+8
58+9
59+10
60+11
61+12
62+13
63+14
64+15
65+16
66+17
67+18
68+19
69+20
70+21
71+.22
72+23
73+24
74+25
75+26
76+27
77+Chairman Phil Mendelson
78+at the request of the Not-for-
79+Profit Hospital Corporation
80+1
81+To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Contract
82+No. NFPHCNUR-19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit
83+Hospital Corporation, commonly known as United Medical Center (“Hospital”),
84+and Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc., for the provision for specialty and non­
85+specialty temporary assignment nurses, and to authorize payment for the services
86+received and to be received under the Contract. (b) UMC determined that exercising Option Year 3 of the Contract was necessary37
87+i'
88+due to the ongoing need for specialty and non-specialty temporary assignment nurses.38
89+The Option Year 3 Modification #7 had a value of $800,000.00 for the period of October39
90+31, 2022 through October 30, 2023, and was fully executed on December 7, 2022.40
91+(c) Proposed Modification #8 for an additional $800,000.00 and a period of41
92+42
93+43
94+the period of October 31, 2022 - October 30, 2023, and would have an aggregate value44
95+45
96+(d) Without this approval, Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc. cannot be paid46
97+for these critical services provided and to be provided in excess of $999,999.99.47
98+Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 248
99+constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that Contract No. NFPHCNUR-49
100+50
101+51
102+52
103+Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.53
104+2
105+that exceeds $1 million in a 12-month period; therefore, Council approval is necessary.
106+i
107+October 30, 2022 through October 30, 2023, is necessary to allow continued use of this
108+Contract. If approved, the combined value of Option Year 3 would be $1,600,000.00 for
109+19-C-003 Modifications 7 and 8 between the Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation and
110+\
111+Contemporary Nursing Solutions Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency
112+Act of 2023, be adopted after a single reading.