District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0220 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/02/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-125  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
May 2, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos. 
1, 2, 3, and 4 to Contract No. CW100309 with The National Center for Children and 
Families to provide Permanent Supportive Housing III program case management 
services to residents experiencing homelessness, and to authorize payment for the goods 
and services received and to be received under the human care agreement and contract. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Contract No. CW100309 with The National Center for Children 
and Families Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a)  There exists an immediate need to approve Contract No. CW100309 with The 
National Center for Children and Families, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, and 4 thereto, to 
provide Permanent Supportive Housing III program case management services to residents 
experiencing homelessness and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to 
be received under the modification. 
(b)  On July 1, 2022, the Office of Contracting and Procurement, on behalf of the 
Department of Human Services, awarded Contract No. CW100309 for the period from July 1, 
2022 through June 30, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $950,000. 
(c)  Modification Nos. 1, 2, and 3 were administrative modifications. 
(d)  Modification No. 4 is now necessary to increase the not-to-exceed amount for 
Contract No. CW100309 to $2,070,892.51.  
(e)  Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the District of Columbia Home 
Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1–204.51(b)), as 
Modification No. 4 will increase the value of the contract in excess of $1 million during a 12-
month period.   
  (f)  Approval is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital services.  Without this 
approval, The National Center for Children and Families cannot be paid for goods and services 
provided in excess of $1 million for the period from July 1, 2022 through June 30, 2023. 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Contract No. CW100309 with The 
National Center for Children and Families Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act 
of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.