District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0226 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/27/2023

                            MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
April 27, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
·Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 
Washington, 
DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
In accordance with section 2 	of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 4 
of the Office and Commission on 
African Affairs Act 
of 2006, effective June 8, 2006 (D.C. Law 16-111; D.C. Official 	Code§ 2-1393), 
I am pleased to nominate the following person: 
Ms. Y odit Shibru 
17th Street 
NW 
Washington, DC 20009 
(Ward 
1) 
for reappointment as a public voting member 	of the Commission on African Affairs, for a term to end 
October 27, 2024. 
Enclosed, 
you will find biographical information detailing the experience 	of the above-mentioned 
nommee, together with a 
proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation 
process. 
I 
would appreciate the Council's earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. 
Please do 
not hesitate to contact me, 	or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor's Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information. 
Sincerely,  YODIT SHIBRU 
SKILLS SUMMARY 
• Over 
15 years experience, knowledge and skills in the process in which projects and 
budgets are formulated, examined, executed and presented. 
• Over 3 years experience in a business counseling profession 
• Administered projects 
of more than 80 organizations. 
• Living and working experience in Africa, Middle East, Asia, Europe and United States 
• Strong oral and written communication skills with the ability to work with all levels 
of government officials, management and donors. 
• Strong managerial and negotiation skills with the ability to introduce new concepts. 
• Fluent in English, French and Amharic. 
• Ability to work both independently and as a member 
of a team. 
• Ability to perform and prioritize a variety 
of tasks within assigned deadlines in a 
fast-paced environment. 
PROFESSIONAL EXPERIENCE 
AEDC/DC-SBDC 
Service Center Director 	06/2017 /Present 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
Responsible for operational management 	of AEDC DC-SBDC Service Center Office 
Supervises Service Center staff and consultants 
Provides direction and assistance to independent consultants as needed 
Provides business consulting to business owners, one-on-one or in groups, in the 
areas 
of business planning, marketing, operations management, financial planning, 
general business practices, local and federal governmental certifications and other 
areas, that will result in economic impacts within realistic time frames and resources 
Provide counseling and technical assistance and advice to business owners interested 
in the global market. 
Directs businesses to appropriate business resources and 
DC-SB DC resource partners 
Assists with special projects as determined by the AEDC President & CEO and Vice 
President & COO and or the needs 
of the small business community. 
Coordinates and conducts training programs for small businesses . 
Prepare and submit DC-SBDC reports, as required . 
Business Consultant 	04/2015 -05/2017 
• Conducted comprehensive analysis 
of potential business venture opportunities 
• Conducted detailed market and demographic studies to ascertain the viability 
of 
proposed and operating ventures. 
• Provided consulting and technical assistances to business owners 
in loan packaging, 
business and marketing plans
,, financial planning and general business practices.  Administrative Assistant 	03/2014 -03/2015 
• Provided support to senior managers and counselors to ensure that they are provided 
with the resources to make effective decisions. 
• Organized and maintained files and records. 
• Planned and schedule meetings and appointments; and other professional 
administrative support as assigned. 
Yo Yo Records LLC 
Chief Executive Officer 	02/2009 -Present 
• Develop and update company business and marketing plans 
• Manage day-to-day implementation 
of projects related to music production and 
managing artists 
• Negotiate contracts on 
behalf of clients; Oversees all aspects 	of a recoding session; 
Hire musicians and singers to perform selected songs. 
Elda Technologies, Alexandria, VA 
Project/Budget Analyst 	01/2010 -01/2014 
• Served as the Lead Budget Analyst for the 	Chief Executive Officer 
• Provided advice and guidance in the day-to-day management, contracting, and on 
potential financial problems; Managed annual grants and contracts. 
Initiative Africa (IA) Addis Ababa, Ethiopia 
Program Manager 	05/2004 -9/2009 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
Designed and managed the implementation 	of activities of more than 52 projects . 
Managed multi-year grants, contract and sub-contracts. Ensured the timely accurate 
submission 
of donor(s) reports. 
Acted as Officer in-Charge 
in absence of Country Director. 
Served as point 
of contact with high level partners, including donors, international 
development organizations, CSOs/NGOs for grants related matters at national and 
international level. 
Managed pre and post ward process 
of multi-year program . 
Provided capacity building support, and technical guidance to relevant CSOs, NGOs, 
private and public institutions. 
Developed, analyzed, and executed estimates 
of annual funding needs for current 
and future fiscal years 
of 21 projects. 
Center for Development Consulting 
Consultant 	09/2003-04/2004 
• Developed gender integrated project proposal, including budget, on needs 
assessment for training in M&E, MIS and Research in all districts 
of Tanzania for 
submission to the Tanzanian Commission on AIDS (T ACAIDS). 
• Facilitated focus group discussion on ICT, Gender and Social issues 
as well as wrote 
a concise field mission report with clear and justified findings and recommendations.  United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees 
Program Officer 	04/1998-02/2002 
• 
• 
• 
• 
• 
Managed contracts, grants and budgets 	of 30 projects for the Refugee & Returnee 
Programs. 
Developed, coordinated and defended project proposals and budgets from 
implementing partners. 
Monitored the disbursement and expenditure level against obligation levels . 
Coordinated plans and activities with government line ministries, partners, and sister 
UN agencies. 
Provided regular functional guidance, practical coaching, constructive feedback and 
technical programming support to field offices and implementing partner staff. 
EDUCATION 
M.A, in International Development and Education -
1996 
George Washington University, Washington DC 
B.A, Business Administration, Minor Computer Information Systems -	1994 
Strayer College/University, Arlington VA  * * * WEARE 
WASHINGTON 
oc 
Executive Office of the Mayor -Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building I 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 I Washington, DC 20004 
Y odit Shibru 
Y odit Shibru is the Services Center Director at Anacostia Economic 
Development Corporation DC-SBDC Network Service Center (AEDC). 
Ms. Shibru currently provides leadership in planning, coordinating, and 
overseeing the development, delivery, and reporting 
of all professional 
programs, activities, and services at AEDC. Previously, Ms. Shibru served 
as Senior Program Manager with Initiative Africa. She was responsible for 
the implementation 
of activities of more than 52 projects. Ms. Shibru acted 
as a liaison between NGOs and donors. She participated in steering 
committee meetings, focus group discussions, task force deliberations and 
other organizational meetings. 
A Ward 1 resident, Ms. Shibru received a Bachelor 
of Arts in Business Administration from 
Stayer University and a Master 
of Arts in International Development and Education from George 
Washington University. 
* * *  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
* * * W~AR~ 
WASHINGTON 
oc 
Office of the General Co unsel to the Mayor 
To: 
From: 
Date: 
Subject: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
Betsy Cavendish 
April 10, 2023 
Legal sufficiency review 
of Resolutions nominating Ify Bozimo, Kate Okoye, 
Salimata Sangare, and 
Y odit Shibru as members of the Commission on African 
Affairs 
. This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable. 
If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office 
of the Mayor, at 
202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
Elizabeth 
A. (Betsy) Cavendish 
The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-768 l