District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0230 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/27/2023

                            MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
April 27, 2023 
The Honorable 
Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John 
A. Wilson Building 
l350Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
In accordance with section 2 	of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 
2-142; D.C. Official Code 
§ 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 215 of the District of Columbia 
Health Occupations Revision Act 
of 1985, effective March 	14, 1995 (D.C. Law 10-205; 
D.C. Official Code§ 3-1202.15), I am pleased 
to nominate the following person: 
Ms. Regina McLinden 
4th Street, SW 
Washington, DC 20024 
(Ward 6) 
for appointment as a massage therapist licensed in the District member 
of the Board of Massage 
Therapy, replacing Joseph Reo, for a tenn to end October 29, 2025. 
Enclosed you will find biographical infonnation detailing the experience of the above­
mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council 	during the 
confirmation process. 
I 
would appreciate the Council's earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. 
Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor's Office of Talent 
and Appointments, should the Council require additional infonnation.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request 
of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
14 To confirm the appointment of Ms. Regina McLinden to the Board 	of Massage Therapy. 
15 
16 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
17 resolution may be cited as the "Board 	of Massage Therapy Regina McLinden Confirmation 
18 Resolution of 2023". 
19 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 
21 
22 	Ms. Regina McLinden 
23 	4th Street, SW 
24 	Washington, DC 20024 
25 	(Ward 6) 
26 
27 as a massage therapist licensed in the District member 	of the Board of Massage Therapy, 
28 pursuant to section 215 	of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act 	of 1985, 
29 effective March 14, 1995 (D.C. Law 10-205; D.C. Official 	Code§ 3-1202.15), replacing Joseph 
30 Reo, for a term to end October 29, 2025. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and 	to the Office of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  Regina 
Mclinden 
LMT, CMLDT, ESTHETICIAN 
Contact 
Credentials 
DC Licensed Massage Therapist 
Mf2295 
DC Certified Esthetician 
CSES5200716 
Klose Training CMLDT 
KTM1020PA12 
AMTA: DC Chapter 
Chair: Commun	irt:y Outreach 
Commit
tee 
Board Secretary 
American Red Cross 
CPR:+ First Aid Certified 
lTM Chiang Mai (Thailand) 
Certified Thai Massage Levels I-	IV 
Education History 
CIDESCO Skincare Certification 2018-2019 
Tajmeel: Qatar International Beauty School 
Massage Therapy Diploma 	2017 
American Massage and Bodywork 	Institute 
High School Diploma with Honors 
Fauquier High School 
Currently Enrolled 
2014 
Northern Virginia Community College (NVCC) 
Work Experience 
Global Wellness Options 
Founder 
Nov 2020 -Present 
• Managing day to day operations of a self-owned 
massage practice, including customer relations, 
advertising, regulatory adherence, and charitable work 
• 
Providing direct services as a licensed massage 
therapist 
Eaton Hotel 	Oct 2019 - Present 
Massage Therapist: Community Outreach 
• Organizing and executing charity massage events for 
unserved members of the community to receive free 
bodywork services. 
The Watergate Hotel 
Massage Therapist 
Oct 2017 - Jan 2021 
• 
Providing direct services as a licensed massage 
therapist in a lux ury environment informed by Forbes 
standards for protocols 
• Traveling internationally to visit product providers 
and receive education on treatment methods  * * * WEARE 
WASHINGTON 
oc 
Executive Office of the Mayor -Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building I 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 I Washington, DC 20004-
Regina McLinden 
Ms. Regina McLinden is a licensed massage therapist and founder 
of Global Wellness Options. 
Throughout her career, Ms. McLinden has been a dedicated 
massage therapist, esthetician, and certified manual lymphatic 
drainage therapist. At Global Wellness Options, her practice is 
uniquely eclectic, utilizing worldly training in different massage 
modalities that explore luxury spa services. Ms. McLinden 
is 
deeply involved with the entire wellness journey 	of her massage 
clients and provides in-depth work that is tailored to individual 
needs. She provides direct services 
as a licensed massage therapist, with gentle approaches 	to 
muscular and lymphatic manipulation. 
Ms. McLinden believes in the power 
of bodywork to serve as a tool in social justice movements 
to empower, nurture, and comfort communities that would benefit from soft touch the most. She 
started Global Wellness Options to make such services available to everyone who was ready 
to 
amplify their approaches to self-care. To expand her reach, Ms. McLinden has since partnered 
with Eaton Workshop DC, to extend free massage and lymphatic drainage services 
to 
underserved members of the community and social activists. She currently serves 	as the chair of 
the AMTA DC Chapter's Community Outreach Committee, as well 	as the secretary of their DC 
board. Ms. McLinden is also a District 
of Columbia certified esthetician, certified in CPR and 
first aid from the American Red Cross, and ITM Chiang Mai certified in Thai massage levels I 
to 
IV. 
A Ward 6 resident, Ms. Regina McLinden is a student majoring in Psychology. 
* * *  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF 	COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
* * * WE ARE 
WASI-IINGT ON 
oc 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
To: 
From: 
Date: 
Subject: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker 
Betsy 
Cavendish 
March 
31, 2023 
Legal sufficiency review 
of Resolutions nominating Cary 	Bland, Johanna Brook s, 
Maisha Goss-Johns, and Regina McLinden as members 	of the Board of Massage 
Therapy 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable. 
If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office 
of the Mayor, at 
202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish 
The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsyl	vania Avenue, NW • S	uite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681