Council | 10/20/2023 | Resolution R25-0292, Effective from Oct 03, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 013891 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0292 | ||
Council | 09/29/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/26/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0238 | ||
Council | 09/25/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 09/20/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 08/25/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 08/17/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/19/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0238 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 05/12/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |