District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0251 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/06/2023

                              ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
 
25-156 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 6, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos. 
10 and 11 to Contract NFPHC-NSD-21-C-00027 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing to 
provide nurse staffing services for the emergency department, intensive care unit, and 
telemetry services, and to authorize payment for the services received and to be received 
under the contract. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DIS TRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 10 and 11 to Contract NFPHC-NSD-21-C-
00027 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 10 and 11 to 
Contract NFPHC-NSD-21-C-00027 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing (“Contract”) to provide 
nurse staffing services for the emergency department, intensive care unit ("ICU"), and telemetry 
services and to authorize payment for the services received and to be received under the 
Contract. 
(b) The Not-for-Profit Hospital Corporation determined that exercising option year 2 of 
the Contract was necessary due to the ongoing need for nurses in the emergency department, 
ICU, and telemetry unit. Modification No.10 exercised partial option year 2, with a value of 
$925,0000 for the period December 10, 2022 through February 7, 2023. 
(c) Proposed Modification No. 11 would exercise the remainder of option year 2 for an 
additional $4,200,000 for the period February 8, 2023 through December 9, 2023.  If approved, 
the combined value of option year 2 would be $5,125,000 for the period December 10, 2022 
through December 9, 2023.  Council approval is necessary because the aggregate value exceeds 
$1 million in a 12-month period. 
(d) Without this approval, Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. cannot be paid for 
critical services provided in excess of $1 million. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 10 and 11 to Contract 
NFPHC-NSD-21-C-00027 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.