7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-166 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | June 6, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to provide that the five |
---|
17 | | - | cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 points or more after submitting a |
---|
18 | | - | medical cannabis facility registration to the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board |
---|
19 | | - | during the open application period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March |
---|
20 | | - | 28, 2022, shall be considered for a manufacturer license. |
---|
21 | | - | |
---|
22 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
23 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency |
---|
24 | | - | Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to increase medical cannabis product |
---|
27 | | - | availability in the District and provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that |
---|
28 | | - | submitted medical cannabis facility registration applications to the Alcoholic Beverage and |
---|
29 | | - | Cannabis Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, (“open application period”) |
---|
30 | | - | that scored 150 points or more be considered for a manufacturer license. |
---|
31 | | - | (b) During the open application period for a cultivation center registration, the medical |
---|
32 | | - | cannabis manufacturer license category did not exist in the District. Prior to March 22, 2023, a |
---|
33 | | - | cultivation center registration was required to manufacture medical cannabis products in the |
---|
34 | | - | District. A number of cultivation center applicants that scored 150 points or more applied to the |
---|
35 | | - | Board with the intention of manufacturing medical cannabis products as part of their business |
---|
36 | | - | plan. |
---|
37 | | - | (c) On March 22, 2023, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2023, effective March |
---|
38 | | - | 22, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-332; 70 DCR 4303), took effect, which requires a medical cannabis |
---|
39 | | - | business to obtain a manufacturer license to manufacture and sell medical cannabis products for |
---|
40 | | - | resale. |
---|
41 | | - | (d) Four of the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 points or more |
---|
42 | | - | as a result of the open application period have been designated by the Department of Small and |
---|
43 | | - | Local Business Development as a Medical Cannabis Certified Business Enterprise with an equity |
---|
44 | | - | impact enterprise certification subcategory. |
---|
45 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
46 | | - | |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | 2 |
---|
51 | | - | (e) With the open application period for unlicensed establishments, including retailer and |
---|
52 | | - | internet retailer applications, beginning on November 1, 2023, it is imperative that the District |
---|
53 | | - | increase the production and the availability of medical cannabis products in the District. |
---|
54 | | - | Consequently, it is necessary for the Council to pass the underlying legislation on an emergency |
---|
55 | | - | basis. |
---|
56 | | - | |
---|
57 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
58 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer |
---|
59 | | - | Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
| 2 | + | 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | ______________________________ 2 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 |
---|
| 5 | + | 4 |
---|
| 6 | + | 5 |
---|
| 7 | + | 6 |
---|
| 8 | + | 7 |
---|
| 9 | + | 8 |
---|
| 10 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 9 |
---|
| 11 | + | _________________ 10 |
---|
| 12 | + | 11 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 |
---|
| 14 | + | _________________________ 13 |
---|
| 15 | + | 14 |
---|
| 16 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to provide that the five 15 |
---|
| 17 | + | cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 points or more after 16 |
---|
| 18 | + | submitting a medical cannabis facility registration to the Alcoholic Beverage and 17 |
---|
| 19 | + | Cannabis Board during the open application period that occurred between 18 |
---|
| 20 | + | November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be considered for a manufacturer 19 |
---|
| 21 | + | license. 20 |
---|
| 22 | + | 21 |
---|
| 23 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 22 |
---|
| 24 | + | this resolution may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification 23 |
---|
| 25 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to increase medical cannabis product 25 |
---|
| 27 | + | availability in the District and provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants 26 |
---|
| 28 | + | that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration applications to the Alcoholic 27 |
---|
| 29 | + | Beverage and Cannabis Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, (“open 28 |
---|
| 30 | + | application period”) that scored 150 points or more be considered for a manufacturer 29 |
---|
| 31 | + | license. 30 |
---|
| 32 | + | (b) During the open application period for a cultivation center registration, 31 |
---|
| 33 | + | the medical cannabis manufacturer license category did not exist in the District. Prior to 32 |
---|
| 34 | + | March 22, 2023, a cultivation center registration was required to manufacture medical 33 2 |
---|
| 35 | + | cannabis products in the District. A number of cultivation center applicants that scored 34 |
---|
| 36 | + | 150 points or more applied to the Board with the intention of manufacturing medical 35 |
---|
| 37 | + | cannabis products as part of their business plan. 36 |
---|
| 38 | + | (c) On March 22, 2023, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2023, 37 |
---|
| 39 | + | effective March 22, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-332; 70 DCR 4303), took effect, which requires 38 |
---|
| 40 | + | a medical cannabis business to obtain a manufacturer license to manufacture and sell 39 |
---|
| 41 | + | medical cannabis products for resale. 40 |
---|
| 42 | + | (d) Four of the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 41 |
---|
| 43 | + | points or more as a result of the open application period have been designated by the 42 |
---|
| 44 | + | Department of Small and Local Business Development as a Medical Cannabis Certified 43 |
---|
| 45 | + | Business Enterprise with an equity impact enterprise certification subcategory. 44 |
---|
| 46 | + | (e) With the open application period for unlicensed establishments, 45 |
---|
| 47 | + | including retailer and internet retailer applications, beginning on November 1, 2023, it is 46 |
---|
| 48 | + | imperative that the District increase the production and the availability of medical 47 |
---|
| 49 | + | cannabis products in the District. Consequently, it is necessary for the Council to pass the 48 |
---|
| 50 | + | underlying legislation on an emergency basis. 49 |
---|
| 51 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 50 |
---|
| 52 | + | constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Medical Cannabis 51 |
---|
| 53 | + | Manufacturer Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single 52 |
---|
| 54 | + | reading. 53 |
---|
| 55 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 54 |
---|