District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0297 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/11/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-214  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the 
District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with 
affordable housing units for Contract No. 2022-LRSP-02A with Dix Street Residences, 
LLC for program units at Dix Street Residences located at 5717 Dix Street, NE.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-LRSP-02A 
with Dix Street Residences, LLC Approval Resolution of 2023.” 
 
Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the 
Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 2022-LRSP-02A, a long-term 
subsidy contract, with Dix Street Residences, LLC  to provide an operating subsidy in support 
of 24 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed $461,808 annually.  
 
 Sec. 3. Transmittal.  
 The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of 
Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.  
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief  Financial Officer as the 
fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  
This resolution shall take effect immediately.