District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0297 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-1
7-
8-A RESOLUTION
9-
10-25-214
11-
1+June 21, 2023
2+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
3+Chairman
4+Council
5+of the District of Columbia
6+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue
7+NW, Suite 504
8+Washington, DC 20004-3003
9+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
10+District of Columbia Housing Authority
11+1133 North Capitol Street N.E.,
12+Washington, DC 20002-7599
13+(202) 535-1000 I dchousing.org
14+Brenda Donald, Executive Director
15+Pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council of
16+the District of Columbia, the Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long
17+Term Subsidy Contract ("AL TSC") between the District
18+of Columbia Housing Authority
19+("DCHA") and Dix Street Residences, LLC (the "Owner") and the proposed "Local Rent
20+Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-02A with Dix Street Residences Approval
21+Resolution
22+of 2023. " DCHA proposes to provide a housing subsidy to the Owner in the amount
23+of $461,808 annually for a multi-year term of fifteen (15) years, in support of the District's
24+Local Rent Supplement Program ("LRSP") to provide affordable housing units at Dix Street
25+Apartments located at 5717 Dix Street, NE.
26+As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the proposed LTSC.
27+In order to facilitate a response to any questions concerning this AL TSC, please have your staff
28+contact me at (202) 535-1513.
29+I look forward to your favorable consideration
30+of this proposed ALTSC agreement.
31+Brenda Donald
32+Executive Director, District
33+of Columbia Housing Authority
34+Enclosures
35+BD/hg
36+cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council
37+OCHA is committed to providing equal access to this event for all participants 6 residents with disabilities. If you need a reasonable accommodation or sign language
38+interpreter service, please contact our AOA/504/Language Department at 202-535-2737 or AOA504@dchousing.org with your complete request. Please allow at least 3
39+business days to make the necessary arrangements. ~ you need a foreign language translator, please contact our AOA/504/Language Department at 202-535-2737 or email
40+LA@dchousing.org. Please allow at least 5 business days to make the necessary arrangements. 1
41+2
42+3
43+4
44+5
45+6
46+7
47+8
48+9
49+10
50+11
51+12
52+13
53+14
54+15
55+16
56+17
57+18
58+19
59+20
60+21
61+22
62+23
63+24
64+25
65+26
66+27
67+28
68+29
69+30
70+31
71+32
72+33
73+34
74+35
75+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
76+~~
77+Chaimrnn Phil Mendelson
78+at the request
79+of District of
80+Columbia Housing Authority
1281 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-July 11, 2023
15-
16-
1782 To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the
18-District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with
19-affordable housing units for Contract No. 2022-LRSP-02A with Dix Street Residences,
20-LLC for program units at Dix Street Residences located at 5717 Dix Street, NE.
21-
22-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this
23-resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-LRSP-02A
24-with Dix Street Residences, LLC Approval Resolution of 2023.”
25-
26-Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
27-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the
83+District's Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with affordable
84+housing units for Contract
85+No. 2022-LRSP-02A with Dix Street Residences, LLC for
86+program units at Dix Street Residences located at 5717 Dix Street, NE.
87+RESOLVED,
88+BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
89+resolution
90+may be cited as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-LRSP-02A
91+with Dix Street Residences, LLC Approval Resolution
92+of 2023."
93+Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II
94+of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support
95+Act
96+of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income
97+households in the District. The passage
98+of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program
99+("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to
100+extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless
101+or in need of
102+supportive services, such as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based,
103+tenant-based, and sponsored-based LRSP affordable housing units. The
104+BSA provided for the
105+District
106+of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf of the
107+District.
108+{0030893
109+-} 1 1 (b) In September of 2021, the District of Columbia's Department of Housing and
110+2 Community Development ("DHCD") issued a Request for Proposals ("RFP") regarding the
111+3 availability
112+of funds from multiple district agencies, including DCHA, DHCD, the Department
113+4
114+of Behavioral Health, the Department of Human Services, and the District of Columbia Housing
115+5 Finance Agency.
116+Of the total proposals received, eleven (11) developers were chosen to work
117+6 with OCHA and others to develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units
118+7 for extremely low income families making zero
119+to thirty percent (30%) of the area's median
120+8 income,
121+as well as the chronically homeless and individuals with mental or physical disabilities
122+9 throughout Washington, DC.
123+IO Upon approval of the contract by the Council, DCHA will enter into an agreement to
124+11 enter into a long-term subsidy contract ("ALTSC") with the selected housing providers under the
125+12 LRSP for housing services.
126+13 (c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long tenn subsidy contract with Dix
127+14 Street Residences, LLC under the LRSP in order to provide long-term affordable housing units
128+15 for extremely low-income households for units located at 5717 Dix Street, NE.
129+16 ( d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an ALTSC between the District
130+17 of Columbia Housing Authority and Dix Street Residences, LLC with respect to the payment of
131+18 a rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Dix Street Residences and
132+19 house extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less of the area median income.
133+20 Sec.
134+3. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
135+21 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code§ 1-204.51), and section 202 of the
136+22
28137 Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C.
29-Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 2022-LRSP-02A, a long-term
30-subsidy contract, with Dix Street Residences, LLC to provide an operating subsidy in support
31-of 24 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed $461,808 annually.
32-
33- Sec. 3. Transmittal.
34- The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
35-Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
36-
37- Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
38-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the
39-fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
40-approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
41-
42-Sec. 5. Effective date.
43-This resolution shall take effect immediately.
138+23 Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Dix Street Residences, LLC
139+{ 0030893 -} 2 1 to provide an operating subsidy in support twenty-four (24) affordable housing units in an
140+2 initial amount not to exceed $461,808 annually.
141+3 Sec.
142+4. Transmittal.
143+4 The Council shall transmit a copy
144+of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
145+5 Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
146+6 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.
147+7 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement
148+of the Chief Financial Officer as the
149+8 fiscal impact statement required
150+by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
151+9 approved October
152+16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D. C. Official Code§ l-301.47a).
153+10 Sec. 6. Effective date.
154+11 This resolution shall take effect immediately.
155+{0030893 -}3