District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0303 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-A RESOLUTION
7-
8-25-307
9-
10-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
11-
12-November 7, 2023
13-
14-
15-To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Peter Winkler to the Public Employee Relations Board.
16-
17- RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
18-resolution may be cited as the "Public Employee Relations Board Peter Winkler Confirmation
19-Resolution of 2023".
20-
21-Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of:
1+MURIEL BOWSER
2+.\'I.- \'OR
3+June 22, 2023
4+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
5+Chairman
6+Council
7+of the District of Columbia
8+John A. Wilson Building
9+1350Pennsylvania Avenue,NW, Suite 504
10+Washington, DC 20004
11+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
12+In accordance with section 2
13+of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law
14+2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01
15+), and pursuant to section 501 of the District of Columbia
16+Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act
17+of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C.
18+Official
19+Code§ 1-605.01), I am pleased to nominate the following person:
2220 Mr. Peter Winkler
2321 Upton Street, NW
2422 Washington, DC 20008
25- (Ward 3)
26-
27-as a public member of the Public Employee Relations Board, established by section 501 of the
28-District of Columbia Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979
29-(D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. Official Code§ 1-605.01), for a term to end December 12, 2025.
30-
31-Sec. 3. The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the
32-nominee and to the Mayor.
33-
34-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
23+(Ward
24+3)
25+for reappointment as a public member of the Public Employee Relations Board, for a term to end
26+December 12, 2025.
27+Enclosed
28+you will find biographical information detailing the expenence of the above­
29+mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the
30+confirmation process.
31+I would
32+appreciate the Council's earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation.
33+Please do not hesitate to contact me,
34+or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor's Office of Talent
35+and Appointments,
36+should the Council require additional information. 1
37+2
38+3
39+4
40+5
41+6
42+7
43+8
44+9
45+10
46+11
47+12
48+13
49+at the request of the Mayor
50+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
51+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
52+14 To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Peter Winkler to the Public Employee Relations Board.
53+15
54+16 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
55+17 resolution may be cited as the "Public Employee Relations Board Peter Winkler Confirmation
56+18 Resolution of 2023".
57+19
58+20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of:
59+21
60+22 Mr. Peter Winkler
61+23 Upton Street, NW
62+24 Washington, DC 20008
63+25 (Ward 3)
64+26
65+27 as a public member of the Public Employee Relations Board pursuant to section 501 of the
66+28 District of Columbia Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979
67+29 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. Official Code§ 1-605.01), for a term to end December 12, 2025.
68+30 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,
69+31 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor.
70+32 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
71+33 PETER WINKLER
72+Experience
73+Member, District of Columbia Public Employee Relations Board, 2020-present.
74+The PERB oversees labor-management relations between the District
75+government and labor organizations that represent its employees. The
76+PERB hears cases presenting issues
77+of representation, unfair labor
78+practices, grievance arbitration award appeals, and standards
79+of conduct. I
80+have served one 3-year term as a neutral member
81+of the PERB, and I have
82+participated in decisions involving the full range
83+of cases that come before it.
84+Attorney, National Labor Relations Board, Washington, DC, 1977-2017.
85+The NLRB, an independent federal agency, administers private-sector labor
86+law in the United States. Initially, I worked in the Board's Appellate Court
87+Branch, representing the Board before the United States Courts
88+of Appeals
89+and other federal courts. During that time, I became a supervisory attorney
90+and then one
91+of two managing supervisors in the Branch. In 2003, I was
92+selected by a newly appointed NLRB member
93+to serve as his chief counsel.
94+Subsequently, I was selected by
95+four successive Board members to serve as
96+chief counsel. In that capacity, I oversaw a staff of about 15 attorneys and
97+was intimately involved in deciding cases, writing opinions, and managing
98+the
99+business of the NLRB.
100+Education
101+University of Michigan Law School, JD Magna Cum Laude, 1977
102+University
103+of Chicago, MA in philosophy, 1974
104+Amherst College, BA, 1973
105+Community Service
106+Volunteer at Washington Studio School, volunteer at Northwest Neighbors
107+Village, volunteer and past officer at Temple Sinai DC.
108+References
109+Richard F. Griffin, Jr., attorney, Bredhoff & Kaiser, 202.842.2600
110+Ronald Meisburg, attorney, Hunton Andrews Kurth, 202.955.1539 * * * Wt:.ARt:.
111+WASHINGT ON
112+oc
113+Executive Office of the Mayor -Office of Talent and Appointments
114+John A. Wilson Building I 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 I Washington, DC 20004
115+Peter Winkler
116+Peter Winkler is a highly experienced labor relations professional
117+and public administrator. He spent forty years at the National Labor
118+Relations Board (NLRB) as an attorney prior
119+to his retirement in
120+2017. At the NLRB, he served as the chief counsel and advisor to
121+five members
122+of the Board. He helped decide unfair labor practice
123+and representation cases that govern private-sector labor law
124+in the
125+United States, and
126+he participated in directing the operations of the
127+Board.
128+Mr. Winkler began his service
129+in the National Labor Relations
130+Board's Appellate Court Branch, where
131+he briefed and argued cases
132+before the United States Court
133+of Appeals. Mr. Winkler also
134+appeared many times in U.S. District Courts, and he drafted the
135+Board's briefs to the United States Supreme Court in several cases.
136+A Ward 3 resident, Mr. Winkler received a Bachelor
137+of Arts degree from Amherst College, a
138+Master
139+of Arts degree from the University of Chicago, and a Juris Doctor degree from the
140+University
141+of Michigan Law School.
142+* * * GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
143+Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser
144+* * *
145+wr;. ARr;.
146+WASHINGTON
147+IX
148+Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor
149+To:
150+From:
151+Date:
152+Subject: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker
153+Betsy Cavendish
154+March 15, 2023
155+Legal sufficiency review
156+of Resolution nominating Peter Winkler as a member of
157+the Public Employee Relations Board
158+This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and
159+found it to
160+be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not
161+hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office
162+of the Mayor, at
163+202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
164+Elizabeth
165+A. (Betsy) Cavendish
166+'!be John A Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681