District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0304 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/27/2023

                    District of Columbia Housing Authority 
300 th Street, SW, 10
th 
Floor, Washington, DC 20024 
202-535-1000 
June 27, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004-3003 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Brenda Donald, Executive Director 
Pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration 	by the Council of the 
District 
of Columbia, the Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long Term 
Subsidy Contract ("ALTSC") between the District 
of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") and 
Jubilee Ontario Place LP (the "Owner"). DCHA proposes to provide a housing subsidy to the Owner 
in the amount 
of $830,688 annually for a multi-year term 	of fifteen (15) years, in support 	of the 
District's Local Rent Supplement Program ("LRSP") to provide affordable housing units at Jubilee 
Ontario Apartments located at 2400 Ontario Road NW. 
Concurrently, I have also enclosed for consideration by the Council the Local Rent Supplement 
Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-04A with Jubilee Ontario Place LP Approval Resolution 
of 2023. 
As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the proposed L TSC. In 
order to facilitate a response to any questions concerning this AL TSC, please have your staff contact 
me at (202) 535-1513. 
I look forward to your favorable consideration 
of this proposed AL TSC agreement. 
Brenda Donald 
Executive Director, District 
of Columbia Housing Authority 
Enclosures 
BD/hg 
cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council 
www.dchousing.org  ~ ~,:::--
4 	at the request 	of District of 
5 	Columbia Housing Authority 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
11 
12 
13 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 	15 years in support of the 
20 
District's Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with affordable 
21 housing units for Contract No. 2022-LRSP-04A with Jubilee Ontario Place LP for 
22 program units at Jubilee Ontario Apartments located at 2400 Ontario 
Road, NW. 
23 
24 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
25 resolution 
may be cited as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-LRSP-04A 
26 with Jubilee Ontario Place LP Approval Resolution 
of 2023". 
27 Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II 
of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support 
28 
Act of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income 
29 households in the District. The passage 
of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program 
30 ("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to 
31 extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless 	or in need of 
32 supportive services, such 	as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based, 
33 tenant-based, and sponsored-based 
LRSP affordable housing units. The 	BSA provided for the 
34 District 
of Columbia Housing Authority ("OCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf of the 
35 District. 
{0030893 
-} 1  1 (b) In September 	of 2021, the District of Columbia's Department of Housing and 
2 Community Development ("DHCD") issued a Request for Proposals ("RFP") regarding the 
3 availability 
of funds from multiple district agencies, including DCHA, DHCD, the Department 
4 
of Behavioral Health, the Department 	of Human Services, and the District 	of Columbia Housing 
5 Finance Agency. 
Of the total proposals received, eleven (11) developers were chosen 	to work 
6 with DCHA and others 
to develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units 
7 for extremely low income families making zero to thirty percent (30%) 
of the area's median 
8 income, 
as well as the chronically homeless and individuals with mental or physical disabilities 
9 throughout Washington, DC. 
10 Upon approval of the contract by the Council, DCHA will enter into an agreement 	to 
11 enter into a long-term subsidy contract ("ALTSC") with the selected housing providers under the 
12 LRSP for housing services. 
13 (c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long term subsidy contract with Jubilee 
14 Ontario Place LP under the LRSP in order 
to provide long-term affordable housing units for 
15 extremely low-income households for units located at 2400 Ontario Road NW. 
16 ( d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an ALTSC between the District 
17 of Columbia Housing Authority and Jubilee Ontario Place LP with respect to the payment 	of a 
18 rental subsidy and allows the owner 	to lease the rehabilitated units at Jubilee Ontario Apartments 
19 and house extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less 	of the area median 
20 mcome. 
21 Sec. 3. Pursuant to section 451 	of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
22 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code 
§ 1-204.51 ), and section 202 	of the 
23 Procurement Practices Reform Act 	of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. 
{0030893 -}2  1 Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Jubilee Ontario Place LP to 
2 provide an operating subsidy in support twenty-three (23) affordable housing units in an 
3 initial amount not to exceed $830,688 annually. 
4 Sec. 
4. Transmittal. 
5 The Council shall transmit a copy 
of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District 	of 
6 Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor. 
7 Sec. 
5. Fiscal impact statement. 
8 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 
of the Chief Financial Officer as the 
9 fiscal impact statement required by section 4a 
of the General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 1975, 
10 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 	Code§ 1-301.47a). 
11 Sec. 6. Effective date. 
12 This resolution shall take effect immediately. 
{ 0030893 -} 3