District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0304 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-1
7-
8-A RESOLUTION
9-
10-25-217
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-July 11, 2023
15-
16-
17-To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the
18-District’s Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with
19-affordable housing units for Contract No. 2022-LRSP-04A with Jubilee Ontario Place LP
20-for program units at Jubilee Ontario Apartments located at 2400 Ontario Road, NW.
21-
1+District of Columbia Housing Authority
2+300 th Street, SW, 10
3+th
4+Floor, Washington, DC 20024
5+202-535-1000
6+June 27, 2023
7+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
8+Chairman
9+Council
10+of the District of Columbia
11+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 504
12+Washington, DC 20004-3003
13+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
14+Brenda Donald, Executive Director
15+Pursuant to D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02, I have enclosed, for consideration by the Council of the
16+District
17+of Columbia, the Council Contract Summary for the Agreement to Enter into a Long Term
18+Subsidy Contract ("ALTSC") between the District
19+of Columbia Housing Authority ("DCHA") and
20+Jubilee Ontario Place LP (the "Owner"). DCHA proposes to provide a housing subsidy to the Owner
21+in the amount
22+of $830,688 annually for a multi-year term of fifteen (15) years, in support of the
23+District's Local Rent Supplement Program ("LRSP") to provide affordable housing units at Jubilee
24+Ontario Apartments located at 2400 Ontario Road NW.
25+Concurrently, I have also enclosed for consideration by the Council the Local Rent Supplement
26+Program Contract No. 2022-ALRSP-04A with Jubilee Ontario Place LP Approval Resolution
27+of 2023.
28+As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding the proposed L TSC. In
29+order to facilitate a response to any questions concerning this AL TSC, please have your staff contact
30+me at (202) 535-1513.
31+I look forward to your favorable consideration
32+of this proposed AL TSC agreement.
33+Brenda Donald
34+Executive Director, District
35+of Columbia Housing Authority
36+Enclosures
37+BD/hg
38+cc: Nyasha Smith, Secretary to the Council
39+www.dchousing.org ~ ~,:::--
40+4 at the request of District of
41+5 Columbia Housing Authority
42+6
43+7
44+8
45+9
46+10 A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
47+11
48+12
49+13 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
50+14
51+15
52+16
53+17
54+18
55+19 To approve an agreement to enter into a long-term subsidy contract for 15 years in support of the
56+20
57+District's Local Rent Supplement Program to fund housing costs associated with affordable
58+21 housing units for Contract No. 2022-LRSP-04A with Jubilee Ontario Place LP for
59+22 program units at Jubilee Ontario Apartments located at 2400 Ontario
60+Road, NW.
61+23
62+24
2263 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
23-resolution may be cited as the “Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-LRSP-04A
24-with Jubilee Ontario Place LP Approval Resolution of 2023”.
25-
26-Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
27-December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and section 202 of the
28-Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C.
29-Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 2022-LRSP-04A, a long-term
30-subsidy contract, with Jubilee Ontario Place LP to provide an operating subsidy in support of
31-23 affordable housing units in an initial amount not to exceed $830,688 annually.
32-
33- Sec. 3. Transmittal.
34- The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
35-Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
36-
37- Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.
38-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the
39-fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
40-approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
41-
42-Sec. 5. Effective date.
43-This resolution shall take effect immediately.
64+25 resolution
65+may be cited as the "Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2022-LRSP-04A
66+26 with Jubilee Ontario Place LP Approval Resolution
67+of 2023".
68+27 Sec. 2. (a) In 2007, the District passed Title II
69+of the Fiscal Year 2007 Budget Support
70+28
71+Act of 2006 ("BSA") to provide funding for affordable housing for extremely low-income
72+29 households in the District. The passage
73+of the BSA created the Local Rent Supplement Program
74+30 ("LRSP"), a program designed to provide affordable housing and supportive services to
75+31 extremely low-income District residents, including those who are homeless or in need of
76+32 supportive services, such as elderly individuals or those with disabilities, through project-based,
77+33 tenant-based, and sponsored-based
78+LRSP affordable housing units. The BSA provided for the
79+34 District
80+of Columbia Housing Authority ("OCHA") to administer the LRSP on behalf of the
81+35 District.
82+{0030893
83+-} 1 1 (b) In September of 2021, the District of Columbia's Department of Housing and
84+2 Community Development ("DHCD") issued a Request for Proposals ("RFP") regarding the
85+3 availability
86+of funds from multiple district agencies, including DCHA, DHCD, the Department
87+4
88+of Behavioral Health, the Department of Human Services, and the District of Columbia Housing
89+5 Finance Agency.
90+Of the total proposals received, eleven (11) developers were chosen to work
91+6 with DCHA and others
92+to develop affordable housing and permanent supportive housing units
93+7 for extremely low income families making zero to thirty percent (30%)
94+of the area's median
95+8 income,
96+as well as the chronically homeless and individuals with mental or physical disabilities
97+9 throughout Washington, DC.
98+10 Upon approval of the contract by the Council, DCHA will enter into an agreement to
99+11 enter into a long-term subsidy contract ("ALTSC") with the selected housing providers under the
100+12 LRSP for housing services.
101+13 (c) There exists an immediate need to approve the long term subsidy contract with Jubilee
102+14 Ontario Place LP under the LRSP in order
103+to provide long-term affordable housing units for
104+15 extremely low-income households for units located at 2400 Ontario Road NW.
105+16 ( d) The legislation to approve the contract will authorize an ALTSC between the District
106+17 of Columbia Housing Authority and Jubilee Ontario Place LP with respect to the payment of a
107+18 rental subsidy and allows the owner to lease the rehabilitated units at Jubilee Ontario Apartments
108+19 and house extremely low-income households with incomes at 30% or less of the area median
109+20 mcome.
110+21 Sec. 3. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved
111+22 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code
112+§ 1-204.51 ), and section 202 of the
113+23 Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C.
114+{0030893 -}2 1 Official Code§ 2-352.02), the Council approves the ALTSC with Jubilee Ontario Place LP to
115+2 provide an operating subsidy in support twenty-three (23) affordable housing units in an
116+3 initial amount not to exceed $830,688 annually.
117+4 Sec.
118+4. Transmittal.
119+5 The Council shall transmit a copy
120+of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the District of
121+6 Columbia Housing Authority and the Mayor.
122+7 Sec.
123+5. Fiscal impact statement.
124+8 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement
125+of the Chief Financial Officer as the
126+9 fiscal impact statement required by section 4a
127+of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
128+10 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code§ 1-301.47a).
129+11 Sec. 6. Effective date.
130+12 This resolution shall take effect immediately.
131+{ 0030893 -} 3