| 4 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | ___________ 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | __________________ 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to preserve continue foreclosure 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC Homeowner Assistance 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | Fund program before September 30, 2022 and whose applications remain under review, 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, and to require notices continue to be 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | sent to homeowners informing them of the DC HAF program prior to a foreclosure action. 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | Coordination Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023.” 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to continue a foreclosure moratorium for 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | certain homeowners who applied for COVID pandemic- related funding from the DC 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | Homeowner Assistance Fund (“DC HAF”) program before September 30, 2022, and whose 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, and to 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | require regular application status updates be provided to those homeowners until their 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | applications are resolved. 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | (b) The District received $50 million in f ederal assistance through the American Rescue 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | Plan Act to assist low- and moderate-income homeowners who experienced new or exacerbated 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | financial hardships as a result of the pandemic and, in June 2022, the Department of Housing and 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | Community Development (“DHCD”) opened applications for DC’s Homeowner Assistance 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | Fund program. 33 2 |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-220 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | July 11, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to continue foreclosure |
---|
18 | | - | protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC Homeowner |
---|
19 | | - | Assistance Fund (“DC HAF") program before September 30, 2022 and whose |
---|
20 | | - | applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, |
---|
21 | | - | and to require that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of the DC |
---|
22 | | - | HAF program before a foreclosure action. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
25 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund |
---|
26 | | - | Coordination Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
27 | | - | |
---|
28 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to continue a foreclosure moratorium for |
---|
29 | | - | certain homeowners who applied for COVID pandemic-related funding from the DC |
---|
30 | | - | Homeowner Assistance Fund (“DC HAF”) program before September 30, 2022, and whose |
---|
31 | | - | applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under appeal, and to |
---|
32 | | - | require regular application status updates be provided to those homeowners until their |
---|
33 | | - | applications are resolved. |
---|
34 | | - | (b) The District received $50 million in federal assistance through the American Rescue |
---|
35 | | - | Plan Act to assist low- and moderate-income homeowners who experienced new or exacerbated |
---|
36 | | - | financial hardships as a result of the pandemic and, in June 2022, the Department of Housing and |
---|
37 | | - | Community Development (“DHCD”) opened applications for DC’s Homeowner Assistance |
---|
38 | | - | Fund (“DC HAF”) program. |
---|
39 | | - | (c) In June 2022, the Council extended the pandemic-related foreclosure moratorium to |
---|
40 | | - | align with the opening of the DC HAF program and required homeowners to submit an |
---|
41 | | - | application for DC HAF assistance to cure housing debts by September 30, 2022, to remain |
---|
42 | | - | eligible for foreclosure protections beyond that initial deadline. |
---|
43 | | - | (d) As of June 30, 2023, DHCD had approved 1,048 DC HAF applications but 400 |
---|
44 | | - | applications were still under review and awaiting potential payment, necessitating an extension |
---|
45 | | - | of the foreclosure moratorium protections previously guaranteed to those homeowners who met |
---|
46 | | - | the September 30, 2022, deadline for their DC HAF applications. DHCD explains that the ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | reasons for delays in processing DC HAF applications and providing payments include |
---|
54 | | - | applicants’ complex requests for assistance with multiple obligations, applicants’ revisions to |
---|
55 | | - | applications, financers’ need to register with DHCD, and financers’ need to verify payment |
---|
56 | | - | details. |
---|
57 | | - | (e) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination |
---|
58 | | - | Temporary Amendment Act of 2022, effective February 23, 2023 (D.C. Law 24-276; 69 DCR |
---|
59 | | - | 15121), is scheduled to expire on October 6, 2023. |
---|
60 | | - | (f) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent any potential gap in the law and protect |
---|
61 | | - | homeowners from foreclosures as they continue to await approvals and payments from DHCD. |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
63 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
64 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner |
---|
65 | | - | Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2022 be adopted after a single |
---|
66 | | - | reading. |
---|
67 | | - | |
---|
68 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 37 | + | (c) In June 2022, the Council extended the pandemic -related foreclosure moratorium to 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | align with the opening of the DC HAF program and required homeowners to submit an 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | application for DC HAF assistance to cure housing debts by September 30, 2022 in order to 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | remain eligible for foreclosure protections beyond that initial deadline. 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | (d) As of June 30, 2023, DHCD had approved 1,048 DC HAF applications, but 400 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | applications were still under review and awaiting potential payment, necessitating an extension 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | of the foreclosure moratorium protections previously guaranteed to those homeowners who met 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | the September 30, 2022 deadline for their DC HAF application s. DHCD explains that the reasons 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | for delays in processing DC HAF applications and providing payments include applicants’ 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | complex requests for assistance with multiple obligations, applicants’ revisions to applications, 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | financers’ need to register with DHCD, and financers’ need to verify payment details. 44 |
---|
| 48 | + | (e) The Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination 45 |
---|
| 49 | + | Temporary Amendment Act of 2022 was passed November 15, 2022, and is scheduled to expire 46 |
---|
| 50 | + | on October 6, 2023. 47 |
---|
| 51 | + | (f) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent any potential gap in the law and protect 48 |
---|
| 52 | + | homeowners from foreclosures as they continue to await approvals and payments from DHCD. 49 |
---|
| 53 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 50 |
---|
| 54 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 51 |
---|
| 55 | + | Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency 52 |
---|
| 56 | + | Amendment Act of 2022 be adopted after a single reading. 53 |
---|
| 57 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 54 |
---|