District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0344 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6- 1
7-A RESOLUTION
8-
9-25-210
10-
1+MURIEL BOWSER
2+MAYOR
3+June 30, 2023
4+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
5+Chairman
6+Council
7+of the District of Columbia
8+John A. Wilson Building
9+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504
10+Washington, D.C. 20004
11+Dear Chairman Mendelson:
12+Enclosed for consideration and enactment
13+by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed
14+bill, the "Modification Nos.
15+15, 16, and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice
16+Masonry, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency
17+Act of2023," and the accompanying
18+emergency declaration resolution.
19+The legislation will approve Modification Nos.
20+15 and 16 and proposed Modification No. 17 to
21+fully exercise option year four
22+of Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry,
23+Inc. for construction and related services for the installation
24+of bicycle and pedestrian facilities. In
25+addition, the legislation will approve payment for services received and to be received under option
26+year four
27+of the contract.
28+If you have any questions regarding this legislation, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, Chief
29+Operating Officer at the Office of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759.
30+I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation.
31+Sincerely, 1
32+2
33+3
34+4
35+5
36+6
37+7
38+8
39+9
40+10
41+11
42+12
43+13
44+14
45+15
46+16
47+17
48+18
49+19
50+20
51+21
52+22
53+23
54+24
55+25
56+26
57+27
58+28
59+29
60+30
61+31
62+32
63+33
64+34
65+~Jll,rtr
66+~Phil Mendelson
67+at the request
68+of the Mayor
69+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
1170 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
12-
13-July 11, 2023
14-
15-
16-To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos.
17-15, 16, and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. to
18-provide construction and related services for the installation of bicycle and pedestrian
19-facilities to the Department of Transportation, and to authorize payment for the goods and
20-services received and to be received under the modifications.
21-
22-RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
23-resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 15, 16, and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-
24-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency
25-Declaration Resolution of 2023”.
26-
27-Sec. 2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 15, 16, and 17
28-to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. to provide construction
29-and related services for the installation of bicycle and pedestrian facilities to the Department of
30-Transportation and authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received
31-under the modifications.
32-(b) By Modification No. 15, dated February 21, 2023, the Office of Contracting and
33-Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Transportation, exercised a part of Option Year 4
34-of Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 for the period February 27, 2023 through May 28, 2023, in
35-the not-to-exceed amount of $999,000.
36-(c) By Modification No. 16, dated May 15, 2023, the Office of Contracting and
37-Procurement, on behalf of the Department of Transportation, exercised another part of Option
38-Year 4 of Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 for the period May 29, 2023 through August 25,
39-2023, at no cost to the District.
40-(d) Modification No. 17 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of Option Year 4 for
41-the period August 26, 2023 through February 26, 2024, in the not-to-exceed amount of
42-$964,602.55, thereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount of Option Year 4 to
43-$1,963,602.55.
44-(e) Council approval is required by section 451(b) of the District of Columbia Home
45-Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51(b)), as the
46-contract will be in excess of $1 million during a 12-month period. ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
71+To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve
72+Modification Nos.
73+15, 16, and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First
74+Choice Masonry, Inc. to provide construction and related services for the
75+installation
76+of bicycle and pedestrian facilities to the Department of
77+Transportation and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and
78+to be received under the modifications.
79+RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That
80+this resolution
81+may be cited as the "Modification Nos. 15, 16, and 17 to Contract No.
82+DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. Approval and
83+Payment
84+Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023".
85+Sec.
86+2. (a) There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 15, 16,
87+and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. to provide
88+construction and related services for the installation
89+of bicycle and pedestrian facilities to
90+the Department
91+of Transportation and authorize payment for the goods and services
92+received and to
93+be received under the modifications.
94+(b)
95+By Modification No. 15, dated February 21, 2023, the Office of Contracting
96+and Procurement,
97+on behalf of the Department of Transportation, exercised a part of 35 option year 4 of Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 for the period February 27, 2023
98+36 through
99+May 28, 2023 in the not-to-exceed amount of $999,000.
100+37 (c)
101+By Modification No. 16, dated May 15, 2023, the Office of Contracting and
102+38 Procurement, on
103+behalf of the Department of Transportation, exercised another part of
104+39 option year 4 of Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 for the period May 29, 2023 through
105+40 August 25, 2023 at no cost to the District.
106+41 (d) Modification No. 17 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of option
107+42 year 4 for the period August 26, 2023 through February 26, 2024 in the not-to-exceed
108+43 amount
109+of $964,602.55, thereby increasing the total not-to-exceed amount of option year
110+44 4 to $1,963,602.55.
111+45 ( e) Council approval
112+is required by section 451 (b) of the District of Columbia
113+46
114+Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code§ 1-
115+47
116+204.5l(b)) since the contract will be in excess of $1 million during a 12-month period.
117+48
118+(f) Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the timely continuation
119+49
120+of these vital services. In addition, without this approval, First Choice Masonry, Inc.
121+50 cannot
122+be paid for goods and services provided in excess of $1 million for the contract
123+51 period February 27, 2023 through February 26, 2024.
124+52 Sec. 3.
125+The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2
126+53 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 15,
127+54
128+16, and 17 to Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc.
129+55 Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single
130+56 reading.
131+57 Sec.
132+4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
51133 2
52- (f) Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the timely continuation of
53-these vital services. In addition, without this approval, First Choice Masonry, Inc. cannot be paid
54-for goods and services provided in excess of $1 million for the contract period February 27, 2023
55-through February 26, 2024.
56-
57-Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute
58-emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 15, 16, and 17 to
59-Contract No. DCKA-2017-C-0047 with First Choice Masonry, Inc. Approval and Payment
60-Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading.
61-
62-Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.