District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0347 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/11/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-209  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
July 11, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to approve Modification Nos. 
5, 6, 7, and 8 to Contract No. DCKA-2022-C-0010 with Lyft Bikes and Scooters, LLC to 
provide bike stations and bike station equipment for the District’s Capital Bikeshare 
system, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received 
under the modifications. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Modification Nos. 5, 6, 7, and 8 to Contract No. DCKA-2022-C-
0010 with Lyft Bikes and Scooters, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a)  There exists an immediate need to approve Modification Nos. 5, 6, 7, and 8 to 
Contract No. DCKA-2022-C-0010 with Lyft Bikes and Scooters, LLC to provide bike stations 
and bike station equipment for the District’s Capital Bikeshare system, and to authorize payment 
for the goods and services received and to be received under the modifications. 
(b)  By Modification No. 5, dated November 30, 2022, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the District Department of Transportation, exercised a part of Option 
Year One of Contract No. DCKA-2022-C-0010 for the period December 6, 2022 through 
February 5, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of $999,000. 
(c)  By Modification No. 6, dated February 3, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the District Department of Transportation, exercised another part of 
Option Year One of Contract No. DCKA-2022-C-0010 for the period February 6, 2023 through 
April 7, 2023, at no additional cost to the District. 
(d)  By Modification No. 7, dated April 7, 2023, the Office of Contracting and 
Procurement, on behalf of the District Department of Transportation, exercised another part of 
Option Year One of Contract No. DCKA-2022-C-0010 for the period April 8, 2023 through July 
7, 2023, at no additional cost to the District. 
(e)  Modification No. 8 is now necessary to exercise the remainder of Option Year One 
for the period July 7, 2023 through December 5, 2023, in the not-to-exceed amount of 
$6,421,464, which will increase the total not-to-exceed amount for Option Year One to 
$7,420,464.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
(f)  Council approval is required by section 451(b)(1) of the District of Columbia Home 
Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51(b)(1)), as 
these modifications increase the value of the contract to more than $1 million during a 12-month 
period.   
  (g)  Approval on an emergency basis is necessary to allow the continuation of these vital 
services.  Without this approval, Lyft Bikes and Scooters, LLC cannot be paid for goods and 
services provided in excess of $1 million for the contract period December 6, 2022 through 
December 5, 2023. 
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Modification Nos. 5, 6, 7, and 8 to 
Contract No. DCKA-2022-C-0010 with Lyft Bikes and Scooters, LLC Approval and Payment 
Authorization Emergency Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.