District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0369 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/19/2023

                    1 
  	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-257 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
September 19, 2023 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing 
Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary agreements.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Declaration 
Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) Section 215 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. 
Law 6-10; D.C. Code § 42-3502.15), allows housing providers to enter into an agreement with 
70% or more of the tenants in a housing accommodation to establish the rent charged, to make 
changes to services and facilities, and to provide for capital improvements. These agreements 
are called voluntary agreements and must be filed with the Rent Administrator. 
(b) In September 2020, the Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization 
held a hearing to contemplate Bill 23-878, the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment 
Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-246; D.C. Official Code § 42-3502.15a) 
(“Law 23-246”), which imposed a 2-year moratorium on voluntary agreements. According to 
the committee report, a majority of public witnesses at the hearing, including then-Director of 
the Department of Housing and Community Development, Polly Donaldson, and Chief Tenant 
Advocate, Johanna Shreve, testified in support of the moratorium. Many expressed the view 
that the legislation should go further and eliminate voluntary agreements altogether. A few 
testimonies stated the importance of voluntary agreements to small landlords, though most 
focused on the negative impact voluntary agreements have had on tenants’ rights and the 
affordable housing stock. 
(c) Because Law 23-246 was subject to appropriations, the moratorium ultimately took 
effect at the beginning of Fiscal Year 2022, not on October 1, 2021. 
(d) The current 2-year moratorium expires on October 1, 2023.  
(e) This emergency measure is necessary to extend the moratorium for one year 
beginning on October 1, 2023, which, while maintaining the continuity of the current law, will 
give the Council time to deliberate a permanent legislative solution that will support tenants and 
minimize harm to both tenants and landlords.  
 
 
 
  2 
  	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Voluntary Agreement 
Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.