| 4 | + | _______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | ________ 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | ______________________ 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary agreements. 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Declaration Resolution of 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | 2023”. 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | Sec. 2. (a) Section 215 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985 (D.C. Code § 42 -16 |
---|
| 20 | + | 3502.21) allows housing providers to enter into an agreement with 70% or more of the 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | tenants in a housing accommodation to establish the rent charged, to make changes to 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | services and facilities, and to provide for capital improvements. These agreements are 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | called voluntary agreements and must be filed with the Rent Administrator. 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | (b) In September 2020, the former Committee on Housing and Neighborhood 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | Revitalization held a hearing to contemplate Bill 23 -878, the “Voluntary Agreement 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | Moratorium Amendment Act of 2020,” which would impose a 2- year moratorium on 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | voluntary agreements. According to the Committee Report, a majority of public 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | witnesses, then -Director of the Department of Housing and Community Development 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | Polly Donaldson, and Chief Tenant Advocate Johanna Shreve testified in support of the 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | moratorium; many expressed that the legislation should go further and eliminate 27 2 |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-257 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | September 19, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend the Rental Housing |
---|
17 | | - | Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary agreements. |
---|
18 | | - | |
---|
19 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
20 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Declaration |
---|
21 | | - | Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) Section 215 of the Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. |
---|
24 | | - | Law 6-10; D.C. Code § 42-3502.15), allows housing providers to enter into an agreement with |
---|
25 | | - | 70% or more of the tenants in a housing accommodation to establish the rent charged, to make |
---|
26 | | - | changes to services and facilities, and to provide for capital improvements. These agreements |
---|
27 | | - | are called voluntary agreements and must be filed with the Rent Administrator. |
---|
28 | | - | (b) In September 2020, the Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
---|
29 | | - | held a hearing to contemplate Bill 23-878, the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Amendment |
---|
30 | | - | Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-246; D.C. Official Code § 42-3502.15a) |
---|
31 | | - | (“Law 23-246”), which imposed a 2-year moratorium on voluntary agreements. According to |
---|
32 | | - | the committee report, a majority of public witnesses at the hearing, including then-Director of |
---|
33 | | - | the Department of Housing and Community Development, Polly Donaldson, and Chief Tenant |
---|
34 | | - | Advocate, Johanna Shreve, testified in support of the moratorium. Many expressed the view |
---|
35 | | - | that the legislation should go further and eliminate voluntary agreements altogether. A few |
---|
36 | | - | testimonies stated the importance of voluntary agreements to small landlords, though most |
---|
37 | | - | focused on the negative impact voluntary agreements have had on tenants’ rights and the |
---|
38 | | - | affordable housing stock. |
---|
39 | | - | (c) Because Law 23-246 was subject to appropriations, the moratorium ultimately took |
---|
40 | | - | effect at the beginning of Fiscal Year 2022, not on October 1, 2021. |
---|
41 | | - | (d) The current 2-year moratorium expires on October 1, 2023. |
---|
42 | | - | (e) This emergency measure is necessary to extend the moratorium for one year |
---|
43 | | - | beginning on October 1, 2023, which, while maintaining the continuity of the current law, will |
---|
44 | | - | give the Council time to deliberate a permanent legislative solution that will support tenants and |
---|
45 | | - | minimize harm to both tenants and landlords. |
---|
46 | | - | |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | 2 |
---|
50 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
51 | | - | |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | |
---|
54 | | - | |
---|
55 | | - | |
---|
56 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 |
---|
57 | | - | constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Voluntary Agreement |
---|
58 | | - | Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
59 | | - | |
---|
60 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 33 | + | voluntary agreements altogether. A few testimonies stated the importance of voluntary 28 |
---|
| 34 | + | agreements to small landlords, though most focused on the negative impact voluntary 29 |
---|
| 35 | + | agreements have had on tenants’ rights and the affordable housing stock. 30 |
---|
| 36 | + | (c) In December 2020, the Council unanimously passed the 2 -year moratorium. 31 |
---|
| 37 | + | Because the measure was subject to appropriations, the moratorium ultimately took effect 32 |
---|
| 38 | + | at the beginning of Fiscal Year 2022 on October 1, 2021. 33 |
---|
| 39 | + | (d) In July 2023, Councilmember Bonds introduced legislation that would 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | eliminate voluntary agreements on a permanent basis. The Council has not yet held a 35 |
---|
| 41 | + | hearing on this new legislation. 36 |
---|
| 42 | + | (e) The existing 2- year moratorium expires on October 1, 2023. 37 |
---|
| 43 | + | (f) This emergency measure is necessary to extend the moratorium for one year, 38 |
---|
| 44 | + | which will give the Council time , while maintaining the continuity of the current law, to 39 |
---|
| 45 | + | deliberate a permanent legislative solution that will support tenants and minimize harm to 40 |
---|
| 46 | + | both tenants and landlords. 41 |
---|
| 47 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 42 |
---|
| 48 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 43 |
---|
| 49 | + | Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a 44 |
---|
| 50 | + | single reading. 45 |
---|
| 51 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 46 |
---|