7 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
| 4 | + | Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to amend Chapter 46 of Title 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | 47 of the District of Columbia Official Code to provide an income tax exemption for 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | homeowners of the River East at Grandview Condominium related to financial assistance 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | from the District government, and to provide that any District financial assistance be 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | excluded from income calculations by District agencies for those residents. 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | RESOLVED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | resolution may be cited as the “River East at Grandview Condominium Assistance Tax 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | Exemption Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On August 16, 2021, engineers from the Falcon Group issued a letter to 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | homeowners at the River East at Grandview Condominiums advising them to vacate the 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | premises within two weeks due to uninhabitable conditions based on the emergence of 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | significant safety concerns from ongoing structural issues. 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | (b) On August 26, 2021, the Falcon Group provided additional detail to their original 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | assessment by determining that families in approximately 30 of the 46 condominium units 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | should move out. 30 2 |
---|
9 | | - | _________ |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | __________________ |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, the Office of Unified Communications Establishment Act of |
---|
18 | | - | 2004 to require the Office of Unified Communications to collect and post publicly on the |
---|
19 | | - | Office’s website the number of calls eligible to be diverted to alternative responses, the |
---|
20 | | - | number of those calls diverted, and data on daily call-taking and dispatching operations; |
---|
21 | | - | and to amend section 16-1053 of the District of Columbia Official Code to add a |
---|
22 | | - | representative of the Office of Unified Communications as a member of the Domestic |
---|
23 | | - | Violence Fatality Review Board. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
26 | | - | act may be cited as the “Office of Unified Communications Transparency and Accuracy |
---|
27 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. |
---|
28 | | - | |
---|
29 | | - | Sec. 2. The Office of Unified Communications Establishment Act of 2004, effective |
---|
30 | | - | December 7, 2004 (D.C. Law 15-205; D.C. Official Code § 1-327.51 et seq.), is amended by |
---|
31 | | - | adding a new section 3207b to read as follows: |
---|
32 | | - | “Sec. 3207b. Call data collection and posting. |
---|
33 | | - | “(a) On a monthly basis, the Office shall collect and publicly post on the Office’s website |
---|
34 | | - | the number of calls eligible to be diverted and the number of calls actually diverted to the: |
---|
35 | | - | “(1) Department of Behavioral Health Access Help Line; |
---|
36 | | - | “(2) District Department of Transportation for motor vehicle collisions that do not |
---|
37 | | - | result in an injury; |
---|
38 | | - | “(3) Department of Public Works for parking enforcement; and |
---|
39 | | - | “(4) Fire and Emergency Medical Services Department Nurse Triage Line. |
---|
40 | | - | “(b) On a monthly basis, the Office shall publicly post the following information on the |
---|
41 | | - | Office's website: |
---|
42 | | - | “(1) Descriptions of each call-taker and dispatcher error, the cause of the error, |
---|
43 | | - | and the corrective action taken by the Office; |
---|
44 | | - | “(2) Number of shifts operated under minimum staffing levels; |
---|
45 | | - | “(3) Average and maximum call to answer times; |
---|
46 | | - | “(4) Average and maximum answer to dispatch times; ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
50 | | - | |
---|
51 | | - | 2 |
---|
52 | | - | “(5) Number of calls in the queue for over 15 seconds; |
---|
53 | | - | “(6) Number of calls dropped following a queue time of over 15 seconds; and |
---|
54 | | - | “(7) Number and type of 911 misuse calls.”. |
---|
55 | | - | |
---|
56 | | - | Sec. 3. Section 16-1053(a) of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended as |
---|
57 | | - | follows: |
---|
58 | | - | (a) Paragraph (9) is amended by striking the phrase “; and” and inserting a semicolon in |
---|
59 | | - | its place. |
---|
60 | | - | (b) Paragraph (10) is amended by striking the period and inserting the phrase “; and” in |
---|
61 | | - | its place. |
---|
62 | | - | (c) A new paragraph (11) is added to read as follows: |
---|
63 | | - | “(11) The Office of Unified Communications.”. |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
66 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
67 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
68 | | - | October 16, 2006 (12 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | Sec. 5. Effective date |
---|
71 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
72 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
73 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section |
---|
74 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
75 | | - | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). |
---|
76 | | - | |
---|
77 | | - | |
---|
78 | | - | |
---|
79 | | - | |
---|
80 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Chairman |
---|
82 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
83 | | - | |
---|
84 | | - | |
---|
85 | | - | |
---|
86 | | - | |
---|
87 | | - | |
---|
88 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Mayor |
---|
90 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
91 | | - | |
---|
| 34 | + | (c) Subsequently, homeowners of these units were forced to vacate their homes and find 31 |
---|
| 35 | + | alternative living arrangements very quickly, and without vital information related to a 32 |
---|
| 36 | + | timeframe for their opportunity to return to their homes. 33 |
---|
| 37 | + | (c) The District government developed multiple assistance programs in response to the 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | displacement of these homeowners, including the use of housing certificates and other resources 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | to ease the transition into temporary residence until appropriate repairs can be made to the 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | Talbert Street property. 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | (d) In order to ensure that displaced homeowners are receiving the full value of the 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | assistance provided by the District government, it is necessary to approve emergency legislation. 39 |
---|
| 43 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 40 |
---|
| 44 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the River 41 |
---|
| 45 | + | East at Grandview Estates Condominium Assistance Tax Exemption Emergency Amendment 42 |
---|
| 46 | + | Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 43 |
---|
| 47 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 44 |
---|