Council | 11/01/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0405 | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 10/24/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/24/2023 | Withdrawn | ||
Council | 10/20/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/13/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/06/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 09/29/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0405 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/18/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |