| 3 | + | _______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | Chairman Phil Mendelson 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | _______ 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | ____________________ 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | to amend the District of Columbia Applications Insurance Implementation Act to repeal 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | the direction to the Mayor that the functions enumerated in the act be delegated to the 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | Director of the Department of Buildings. 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Floodplain Review Authority Congressional Review Emergency 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council approved the Floodplain Review Authority 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25- 188; 70 DCR 10716) 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | (“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on October 25, 2023. 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | (b) The Floodplain Temporary Amendment Act of 2023 (Bill 25 -355) was approved by 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | the Council on final reading at the September 19, 2023 legislative meeting. Because the 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | temporary measure must undergo congressional review, it will not be in effect before the 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | emergency measure expires. 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | (c) This congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | the expiration of the emergency measure and effective date of the temporary measure. 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 33 2 |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-271 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | October 3, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
18 | | - | to amend the District of Columbia Applications Insurance Implementation Act to repeal |
---|
19 | | - | the direction to the Mayor that the functions enumerated in the act be delegated to the |
---|
20 | | - | Director of the Department of Buildings. |
---|
21 | | - | |
---|
22 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
23 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Floodplain Review Authority Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
24 | | - | Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council approved the Floodplain Review Authority |
---|
27 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-188; 70 DCR 10716) |
---|
28 | | - | (“emergency measure”). The emergency measure is set to expire on October 25, 2023. |
---|
29 | | - | (b) The Floodplain Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on |
---|
30 | | - | September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-355) (“temporary measure”), was approved by |
---|
31 | | - | the Council on final reading at the September 19, 2023, legislative meeting. Because the |
---|
32 | | - | temporary measure must undergo congressional review, it will not be in effect before the |
---|
33 | | - | emergency measure expires. |
---|
34 | | - | (c) This congressional review emergency is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between |
---|
35 | | - | the expiration of the emergency measure and effective date of the temporary measure. |
---|
36 | | - | |
---|
37 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
38 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Floodplain Review Authority |
---|
39 | | - | Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 37 | + | Floodplain Review Authority Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be 34 |
---|
| 38 | + | adopted after a single reading. 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 36 |
---|