District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0441 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 10/03/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-278  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
October 3, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Walter Reed Development Omnibus Act of 2016 to provide that revenues 
received from the Developer as Initial Consideration Payments under the Walter Reed 
Land and Disposition Agreement shall, after October 1, 2023, be deposited into the 
Walter Reed Reinvestment Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer to pay or 
reimburse certain costs of job creation and economic development of or related to the 
Walter Reed Redevelopment Site. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Walter Reed Development Assistance Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed 
Development Assistance Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective August 2, 2023 (D.C. 
Act 25-215; 70 DCR 10929), which is scheduled to expire on October 31, 2023. 
(b) The Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed Development Assistance 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled 
version of Bill 25-384), which will become effective following approval by the Mayor (or, in the 
event of a veto, Council action to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review, 
and publication in the Register. 
(c) To avoid an imminent lapse in the law between the expiration of the emergency act 
and the effective date of the temporary act, it is necessary to pass congressional review 
emergency legislation. 
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Walter Reed Development Assistance 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.