7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
| 12 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 1 |
---|
| 13 | + | 2 |
---|
| 14 | + | ____________ 3 |
---|
| 15 | + | 4 |
---|
| 16 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 |
---|
| 17 | + | 6 |
---|
| 18 | + | _______________ 7 |
---|
| 19 | + | 8 |
---|
| 20 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 9 |
---|
| 21 | + | to amend the Walter Reed Development Omnibus Act of 2016 to provide that revenues 10 |
---|
| 22 | + | received from the Developer as Initial Consideration Payments under the Walter Reed 11 |
---|
| 23 | + | Land and Disposition Agreement (LDA) shall, after October 1, 2023, be deposited into 12 |
---|
| 24 | + | the Walter Reed Reinvestment Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer to pay or 13 |
---|
| 25 | + | reimburse certain costs of job creation and economic development of or related to the 14 |
---|
| 26 | + | Walter Reed Redevelopment Site. 15 |
---|
| 27 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 16 |
---|
| 28 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Walter Reed Development Assistance Congressional Review 17 |
---|
| 29 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 18 |
---|
| 30 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed 19 |
---|
| 31 | + | Development Assistance Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective August 2, 2023 (D.C. 20 |
---|
| 32 | + | Act 25-215; 70 DCR 10929) (“Emergency Act”). The Emergency Act is scheduled to expire on 21 |
---|
| 33 | + | October 31, 2023. 22 |
---|
| 34 | + | (b) The Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed Development Assistance 23 |
---|
| 35 | + | Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled 24 |
---|
| 36 | + | version of B25-384) (“Temporary Act”), which was transmitted to the Mayor on September 26, 25 |
---|
| 37 | + | 2023. The Temporary Act will become effective following approval by the Mayor (or, in the 26 |
---|
| 38 | + | 2 |
---|
9 | | - | 25-278 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | October 3, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
17 | | - | to amend the Walter Reed Development Omnibus Act of 2016 to provide that revenues |
---|
18 | | - | received from the Developer as Initial Consideration Payments under the Walter Reed |
---|
19 | | - | Land and Disposition Agreement shall, after October 1, 2023, be deposited into the |
---|
20 | | - | Walter Reed Reinvestment Fund and issued as a grant to the Developer to pay or |
---|
21 | | - | reimburse certain costs of job creation and economic development of or related to the |
---|
22 | | - | Walter Reed Redevelopment Site. |
---|
23 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Walter Reed Development Assistance Congressional Review |
---|
25 | | - | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed |
---|
28 | | - | Development Assistance Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective August 2, 2023 (D.C. |
---|
29 | | - | Act 25-215; 70 DCR 10929), which is scheduled to expire on October 31, 2023. |
---|
30 | | - | (b) The Council unanimously passed the Walter Reed Development Assistance |
---|
31 | | - | Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled |
---|
32 | | - | version of Bill 25-384), which will become effective following approval by the Mayor (or, in the |
---|
33 | | - | event of a veto, Council action to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review, |
---|
34 | | - | and publication in the Register. |
---|
35 | | - | (c) To avoid an imminent lapse in the law between the expiration of the emergency act |
---|
36 | | - | and the effective date of the temporary act, it is necessary to pass congressional review |
---|
37 | | - | emergency legislation. |
---|
38 | | - | |
---|
39 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
40 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Walter Reed Development Assistance |
---|
41 | | - | Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 40 | + | event of a veto, Council action to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review, 27 |
---|
| 41 | + | and publication in the D.C. Register. 28 |
---|
| 42 | + | (c) To avoid an imminent lapse in the law between the expiration of the Emergency Act 29 |
---|
| 43 | + | and the effective date of the Temporary Act, it is necessary to approve congressional review 30 |
---|
| 44 | + | emergency legislation. 31 |
---|
| 45 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 32 |
---|
| 46 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Walter 33 |
---|
| 47 | + | Reed Development Assistance Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be 34 |
---|
| 48 | + | adopted after a single reading. 35 |
---|
| 49 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 36 |
---|