District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0454 Introduced / Bill

Filed 10/02/2023

                     
 
1 
 
 	____________________________ 1 
Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2 
 3 
 4 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 5 
 6 
_______________ 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
 10 
________________________ 11 
 12 
 13 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 14 
to amend Chapter 3 of Title 13 of the District of Columbia Official Code, to include 15 
appointments of a vulnerable youth guardian under legal actions that may have published 16 
notice in substitution of personal service of process, and to amend Chapter 23 of Title 16 17 
of the District of Columbia Official Code to authorize the Family Division of the 18 
Superior Court to appoint, modify, and terminate a new class of legal guardianship for 19 
vulnerable youth.   20 
 21 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 
resolution may be cited as the “Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Congressional 23 
Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship 25 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-203; 70 DCR 10758) 26 
(“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. 27 
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Temporary 28 
Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 29 
25-386) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have a projected law date. 30 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 31 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  32 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 33 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 34   
 
2 
 
Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act 35 
of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 36 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37