| 5 | + | ____________________________ 1 |
---|
| 6 | + | Councilmember Brooke Pinto 2 |
---|
| 7 | + | 3 |
---|
| 8 | + | 4 |
---|
| 9 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 5 |
---|
| 10 | + | 6 |
---|
| 11 | + | _______________ 7 |
---|
| 12 | + | 8 |
---|
| 13 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 |
---|
| 14 | + | 10 |
---|
| 15 | + | ________________________ 11 |
---|
| 16 | + | 12 |
---|
| 17 | + | 13 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 14 |
---|
| 19 | + | to amend Chapter 3 of Title 13 of the District of Columbia Official Code, to include 15 |
---|
| 20 | + | appointments of a vulnerable youth guardian under legal actions that may have published 16 |
---|
| 21 | + | notice in substitution of personal service of process, and to amend Chapter 23 of Title 16 17 |
---|
| 22 | + | of the District of Columbia Official Code to authorize the Family Division of the 18 |
---|
| 23 | + | Superior Court to appoint, modify, and terminate a new class of legal guardianship for 19 |
---|
| 24 | + | vulnerable youth. 20 |
---|
| 25 | + | 21 |
---|
| 26 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 |
---|
| 27 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Congressional 23 |
---|
| 28 | + | Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship 25 |
---|
| 30 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-203; 70 DCR 10758) 26 |
---|
| 31 | + | (“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. 27 |
---|
| 32 | + | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Temporary 28 |
---|
| 33 | + | Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 29 |
---|
| 34 | + | 25-386) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have a projected law date. 30 |
---|
| 35 | + | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 31 |
---|
| 36 | + | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 32 |
---|
| 37 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 33 |
---|
| 38 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 34 |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-266 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | October 3, 2023 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
18 | | - | to amend Chapter 3 of Title 13 of the District of Columbia Official Code, to include |
---|
19 | | - | appointments of a vulnerable youth guardian under legal actions that may have published |
---|
20 | | - | notice in substitution of personal service of process, and to amend Chapter 23 of Title 16 |
---|
21 | | - | of the District of Columbia Official Code to authorize the Family Division of the |
---|
22 | | - | Superior Court to appoint, modify, and terminate a new class of legal guardianship for |
---|
23 | | - | vulnerable youth. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
26 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Congressional |
---|
27 | | - | Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
28 | | - | |
---|
29 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship |
---|
30 | | - | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 27, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-203; 70 DCR 10758) |
---|
31 | | - | (“emergency act”), which expires on October 25, 2023. |
---|
32 | | - | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Temporary |
---|
33 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023, passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill |
---|
34 | | - | 25-386) (“temporary act”), which does not yet have a projected law date. |
---|
35 | | - | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the |
---|
36 | | - | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
39 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Vulnerable Youth Guardianship |
---|
40 | | - | Protection Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single |
---|
41 | | - | reading. |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 42 | + | Vulnerable Youth Guardianship Protection Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act 35 |
---|
| 43 | + | of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 36 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37 |
---|