| 17 | + | 13 |
---|
| 18 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need to 14 |
---|
| 19 | + | amend the Freedom of Information Act of 1976 to exempt from disclosure critical 15 |
---|
| 20 | + | infrastructure information or plans that contain critical infrastructure information for the 16 |
---|
| 21 | + | critical infrastructures of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority. 17 |
---|
| 22 | + | 18 |
---|
| 23 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 19 |
---|
| 24 | + | resolution may be cited as the “DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information 20 |
---|
| 25 | + | Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 21 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the DC Water Critical Infrastructure 22 |
---|
| 27 | + | Freedom of Information Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 26, 2023 23 |
---|
| 28 | + | (D.C. Act 25-201; 70 DCR 10754) (“emergency act”), which will expire on October 24, 2023. 24 |
---|
| 29 | + | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the DC Water Critical Infrastructure 25 |
---|
| 30 | + | Freedom of Information Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, approved on 2nd 26 |
---|
| 31 | + | reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-380) (“temporary act”), which was 27 |
---|
| 32 | + | transmitted to the Mayor on July 26, 2023, with a response from the Mayor due on October 11, 28 |
---|
| 33 | + | 2023. 29 |
---|
| 34 | + | 2 |
---|
6 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | 25-277 |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | October 3, 2023 |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
16 | | - | to amend the Freedom of Information Act of 1976 to exempt from disclosure critical |
---|
17 | | - | infrastructure information or plans that contain critical infrastructure information for the |
---|
18 | | - | critical infrastructures of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
21 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom of Information |
---|
22 | | - | Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council passed the DC Water Critical Infrastructure |
---|
25 | | - | Freedom of Information Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective July 26, |
---|
26 | | - | 2023 (D.C. Act 25-201; 70 DCR 10754) (“emergency act”), which will expire on October 24, |
---|
27 | | - | 2023. |
---|
28 | | - | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council passed the DC Water Critical Infrastructure |
---|
29 | | - | Freedom of Information Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, approved on 2nd |
---|
30 | | - | reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-380) (“temporary act”), which was |
---|
31 | | - | transmitted to the Mayor on July 26, 2023, with a response from the Mayor due on October 11, |
---|
32 | | - | 2023. |
---|
33 | | - | (c) The temporary act cannot complete 30 days of congressional review before October |
---|
34 | | - | 24, 2023, when the emergency act will expire. |
---|
35 | | - | (d) This congressional emergency is now necessary to prevent a gap in the law between |
---|
36 | | - | the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
39 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom |
---|
40 | | - | of Information Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be |
---|
41 | | - | adopted after a single reading. |
---|
42 | | - | |
---|
43 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 36 | + | (c) The temporary act cannot complete 30 days of congressional review before October 24, 30 |
---|
| 37 | + | 2023, when the emergency act will expire. 31 |
---|
| 38 | + | (d) This congressional emergency is now necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 32 |
---|
| 39 | + | the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 33 |
---|
| 40 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 34 |
---|
| 41 | + | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the DC Water Critical Infrastructure Freedom 35 |
---|
| 42 | + | of Information Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be 36 |
---|
| 43 | + | adopted after a single reading. 37 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 38 |
---|