Council | 02/09/2024 | Resolution R25-0315, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001491 | ||
Council | 12/12/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0315 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0471 | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/17/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 10/13/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0471 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/05/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |