Council | 12/29/2023 | Resolution R25-0386, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016612 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0386 | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/14/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 12/13/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0476 | ||
Council | 12/08/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 11/09/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 11/03/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/02/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/26/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/20/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0476 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/17/2023 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 10/12/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |