MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR October 20, 2023 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01) and pursuant to section 1812 of the Office of the Chief Technology Officer Establishment Act of 1998, effective March 26, 1999 (D.C. Law 12-175; D.C. Official Code § 1-1401), I am pleased to nominate the following person: Dr. Christopher Rodriguez Sedgwick Street NW Washington, DC 20016 (Ward 3) for appointment as the Chief Technology Officer of the District of Columbia, to serve at the pleasure of the Mayor. Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing Dr. Rodriquez’s experience, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Mayor 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 £~~ at the request of the Mayor A PROPOSED RESOLUTION IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 To confirm the appointment of Dr. Christopher Rodriguez as the Chief Technology Officer of 15 the District of Columbia. 16 17 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 18 resolution may be cited as the "Chief Technology Officer Dr. Christopher Rodriguez 19 Confirmation Resolution of 2023 ". 20 21 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of: 22 23 24 25 26 27 Dr. Christopher Rodriguez Sedgwick Street NW Washington, DC 20016 (Ward 3) 28 as the Chief Technology Officer of the District of Columbia, established by section 1812 of the 29 Office of the Chief Technology Officer Establishment Act of 1998, effective March 26, 1999 30 (D.C. Law 12-175; D.C. Official Code§ 1-1401), to serve at the pleasure of the Mayor. 31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon 32 its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. 33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. EXPERIENCE Director,DCHomelandSecurityandEmergencyManagementAgency Washington,DC,2017-Present ‘*ServeasWashingtonDC’stopexecutiveonhomelandsecurity,intelligenceanalysis, emergencymanagementandpreparedness,andoperationalcoordination; '*Guideanagencyof200personnelwithanannualbudgetof$200M; ‘©Ledorganizationaltransformationofinternalplans,processes,andproceduresfor administrationandemergencypreparedness,resilience,andresponse; '*Resourceeffortstoenablecitywideemergencypreparednessandresilience; '*ActedastopemergencymanagerforWashington,DCinthelead-upto,andduring,the January6"attackattheUSCapitolandthe59”PresidentialInauguration; ‘©AssumedtheroleofIncidentCommanderforWashingtonDC’sCOVID-19response— includingsettingobjectives;managingbudgets;conductingtrainingandexercises;and developingpoliciesandplansforimplementation; +Fostercollaborationandtransparencywitfederal,state,loca,international,andbusiness partners—includinginthetechnologysectorandotherat-riskindustries AdjunctProfessor,SchoolofContinuingStudies,GeorgetownUniversity Washington,DC,2020-Present ‘*Teachgraduate-levelclassesinemergencymanagement,resilience,information-sharing, homelandsecurity,crisiscommunications,andpublicadministration Director,NewJerseyOfficeofHomelandSecurityandPreparedness Trenton,NJ,2014~1;of “iy ‘©ServedasNewJersey'stopexecutiveoncybersecurity,emergencypreparedness,homeland security,andcrisismanagement.Createdandsustainedopen-sourcecollectionand disseminationonallthreatsandhazardsandcyberthreatstoinformlocal,state,federal, andprivate-sectorpolicies,riskmitigation,andresilience; '*Oversawallcrisispreventionandanalysis,aswellasthesharingofbestpracticesforpublic institutionsandcriticalinfrastructure; ‘+Marshalledcollectivecapacitywithlocal,state,federal,international,andacademic partners,includinginthetechnologyandcriticalinfrastructurespaces BranchChief,CounterterrorismandEconomicSecurityCenters,CIA Langley,VA,2003-14 ‘+LedanalyticteamsthatproducedstrategicintelligenceandoperationalplansforseniorUS policymakersandforeigncounterpartsonenergysecurity,counterterrorism,cybersecurity, Endbroaderglobalandeconomicsecuritytrends; ‘©BriefeddozensofforeigndiplomatsandintelligenceofficialsacrossEurope,theMiddle East,SoutheastAsia,andLatinAmerica; '*ProvidedstrategicandtacticalanalysisforUSmilitaryoperationsinAfghanistan,Iraq, Pakistan,Somalia,andYemen; ‘+LivedinBrussels,Belgium,servingtheBilateral,EU,andNATOMissions; ‘©ServedinIraqandotherMiddleEastcountries EDUCATION ‘©UniversityofNotreDame,PhD/MA,DepartmentofPoliticalScience SouthBend,IN,2006/2002 ‘©WilliamsCollege,BA,PoliticalEconomy Williamstown,MA,1999 Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor's Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 Dr. Christopher Rodriguez Dr. Christopher Rodriguez is the Acting Chief Technology Officer. He is the former Director of the Homeland Security and Emergency Management Agency (“HSEMA”), where he served as the Homeland Security Advisor and State Coordinating Officer for the District of Columbia, as well as the State Administrative Agent for all homeland security federal grants funding for the District and the National Capital Region, which includes parts of Northern Virginia and Maryland. Dr. Rodriguez was responsible for emergency planning, preparedness, response, and recovery for the District, including operations for a 24- hour emergency operations center and the Washington Regional Threat Analysis Center, the District’s intelligence fusion center. Prior to his service with District Government, Dr. Rodriguez served as the Director of New Jersey’s Office of Homeland Security where he led statewide strategies, policies, and operations on counterterrorism, resiliency, and cybersecurity. While serving in New Jersey, his home state, Dr. Rodriguez led the office during a national rise in homegrown violent extremism and established close relationships with the private sector and federal, state, and local law enforcement. Recognizing the critical role the public plays in stopping attacks before they happen, Dr. Rodriguez also increased the office’s engagement with the public—building and maintaining key relationships with faith-based communities. Dr. Rodriguez served for more than a decade in the Central Intelligence Agency (“CIA”) and the U.S. Department of State, where he held a variety of analytical and management positions. Following the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001, Dr. Rodriguez joined the CIA, where he became a senior analyst in its Counterterrorism Center. In this position, he monitored terrorist groups in the Middle East and South Asia, closely collaborating with U.S. Intelligence Community partners at the federal, state, and local levels to identify and counter persistent threats to the United States and its allies. During his time at the CIA, Dr. Rodriguez also oversaw an analytic unit that handled global economic and energy security, as well as related counterintelligence and cyber threats. From 2009 to 2011, while deployed at the U.S. Embassy in Brussels, Dr. Rodriguez was a key U.S. interlocutor with the European Union during the height of the Euro currency crisis. He has been recognized by the CIA and Director of National Intelligence for his leadership and professional achievements. Dr. Rodriguez earned his Bachelor of Arts from Williams College, and his Master of Arts and Doctor of Philosophy in Political Science from the University of Notre Dame. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724 -7681 To: Tommy Wells, Steve Walker From: Betsy Cavendish Date: October 17, 2023 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Dr. Christopher Rodriguez as Chief Technology Officer This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above- referenced resolution and found it to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202 - 724-1303, or me at 202- 724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish