Council | 06/21/2024 | Resolution R25-0493, Effective from May 07, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007212 | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0500 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0493 | ||
Council | 05/07/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 03/20/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 03/15/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/12/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/22/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/02/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/25/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 11/03/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0500 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/26/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |