District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0508 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 11/07/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-306  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
November 7, 2023 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to allow consumers to request that credit reporting agencies include a statement with their 
credit reports to indicate they were financially impacted by the COVID-19 pandemic. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council adopted the Public Health Emergency Credit 
Alert Emergency Amendment Act of 2023. The act became law on July 31, 2023, and expired on 
October 29, 2023. 
(b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the Public Health Emergency Credit 
Alert Temporary Amendment Act of 2023. The temporary measure was signed by the Mayor on 
October 11, 2023.   
(c) The measure has not completed its 30-day congressional review period. 
(d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 
the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Public Health Emergency Credit Alert 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
 Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.