3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-306 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | November 7, 2023 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
17 | | - | to allow consumers to request that credit reporting agencies include a statement with their |
---|
18 | | - | credit reports to indicate they were financially impacted by the COVID-19 pandemic. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
21 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional Review |
---|
22 | | - | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council adopted the Public Health Emergency Credit |
---|
25 | | - | Alert Emergency Amendment Act of 2023. The act became law on July 31, 2023, and expired on |
---|
26 | | - | October 29, 2023. |
---|
27 | | - | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the Public Health Emergency Credit |
---|
28 | | - | Alert Temporary Amendment Act of 2023. The temporary measure was signed by the Mayor on |
---|
29 | | - | October 11, 2023. |
---|
30 | | - | (c) The measure has not completed its 30-day congressional review period. |
---|
31 | | - | (d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between |
---|
32 | | - | the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
35 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Public Health Emergency Credit Alert |
---|
36 | | - | Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 2 | + | 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | ______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 5 | + | 3 |
---|
| 6 | + | 4 |
---|
| 7 | + | 5 |
---|
| 8 | + | 6 |
---|
| 9 | + | 7 |
---|
| 10 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 11 | + | 9 |
---|
| 12 | + | ______ 10 |
---|
| 13 | + | 11 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 |
---|
| 15 | + | 13 |
---|
| 16 | + | __________________ 14 |
---|
| 17 | + | 15 |
---|
| 18 | + | 16 |
---|
| 19 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to 17 |
---|
| 20 | + | the need to allow consumers to request that credit reporting agencies include a 18 |
---|
| 21 | + | statement with their credit reports to indicate they were financially impacted by 19 |
---|
| 22 | + | the COVID-19 pandemic. 20 |
---|
| 23 | + | 21 |
---|
| 24 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 22 |
---|
| 25 | + | this resolution may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional 23 |
---|
| 26 | + | Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023”. 24 |
---|
| 27 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On July 11, 2023, the Council adopted the “Public Health Emergency 25 |
---|
| 28 | + | Credit Alert Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. The Act became law on July 31, 2023 26 |
---|
| 29 | + | and expires on October 29, 2023. 27 |
---|
| 30 | + | (b) On September 19, 2023, the Council adopted the “Public Health Emergency 28 |
---|
| 31 | + | Credit Alert Temporary Amendment Act of 2023.” The temporary measure was signed 29 |
---|
| 32 | + | by the Mayor on October 11, 2023. 30 |
---|
| 33 | + | (c) The measure has not completed its 30-day Congressional review period. 31 |
---|
| 34 | + | (d) This identical emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law 32 |
---|
| 35 | + | between the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 33 |
---|
| 36 | + | 34 |
---|
| 37 | + | 2 |
---|
| 38 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the 35 |
---|
| 39 | + | circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it 36 |
---|
| 40 | + | necessary that the Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional Review 37 |
---|
| 41 | + | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023 must be adopted after a single reading. 38 |
---|
| 42 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39 |
---|